Advanced Recovery Systems v. American Agencies et al

Plaintiff: Advanced Recovery Systems
Defendant: American Agencies, NRA Group and Steven C. Kusic
Case Number: 2:2013cv00283
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B. Pead
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 580 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 572 Motion to Stay Upon Appeal and Filing of Cash Bond. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 4/29/2019. (eat)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 576 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying Objections (Docket Entries 562 and 563 ) to Writ of Garnishment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 4/15/2019. (eat)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 535 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 502 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/9/2018. (eat)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 498 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 492 Defendants' Motion for Offset of Damages Based on Settlement. The court offsets $400,000 of the Sajax Settlement against the damages awarded on the Interference with Contract claim and $5,000 of the Sajax Settlement against the damages awarded on the Copyright Infringement claim. The court requests that AA submit a Final Judgment to the court within 5 days of the date of this Order incorporating the setoffs granted in this Order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 10/26/2017. (eat)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 463 American Agencies' Motion for Punitive Damages, Litigation Expenses, and Prejudgment Interest; denying 468 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. The Court requests that American Agencies submit a Final Judgment to the Court within 5 days of the date of this Order incorporating the awards granted in this Order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/6/2017. (eat)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 398 AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER replacing 394 Memorandum Decision and Order. The Court's Memorandum Decision and Order is Amended to correct the term AA with ARS on the fourth line from the bottom on page 7 of the decision. The relevant clause is amended to state "that ARS did not breach the License Agreement." No other changes have been made. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/6/17. (sih)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: AA's Motion in Limine No. 1: Issues Resolved on Summary Judgment 339 is GRANTED; AA's Motion in Limine No. 2: ARS' Disproven Allegations Regarding the $150,000 340 is GRANTED I N PART AND DENIED IN PART; AAs Motion in Limine No. 3: Irrelevant Personal Information 341 is MOOT; AA's Motion in Limine No. 4: Settlement Communications with Sajax Software, LLC 342 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Defendants' Sealed Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Richard S. Hoffman 338 is DENIED; Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Irrelevant and/or Prejudicial Evidence of or Reference to the Court's PriorRulings 343 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; and Defendants' Motion to Compel Disclosure of Settlement Agreement and Accounting 361 is GRANTED with limitations discussed in the order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/6/17. (dla)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 345 Second Motion for Reconsideration re 309 Memorandum Decision and Order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2/27/17. (dla)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 278 Counterclaim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint; ARS's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint 302 is moot; denying 315 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, except as to the one statement alleging copyright infringement in the tortious interference claim. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2/21/17. (dla)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 320 Motion for Reconsideration of Rulings in Memorandum Decision and Order Dated 9/28/2016. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2/2/17. (dla)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 158 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 160 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/25/2015. (jwt)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 122 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 128 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 10/1/2015. (jwt)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 AA's Motion to Dismiss Sajax's Counterclaim for Failure to State a Claim ; denying 99 Counterclaim Defendant's Motion to Dismiss AA's copyright infringement. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/21/2015. (jds)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDERgranting 42 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct Counterclaim and Add Parties. AA shall file its proposed Amended Counterclaim within 7 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/4/2014. (jds)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; granting 21 Motion to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/7/13. (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Recovery Systems v. American Agencies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Recovery Systems
Represented By: Michael F. Krieger
Represented By: Gregory S. Moesinger
Represented By: Adam D. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Agencies
Represented By: Robert O. Rice
Represented By: Liesel B. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRA Group
Represented By: Robert O. Rice
Represented By: Liesel B. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C. Kusic
Represented By: Robert O. Rice
Represented By: Liesel B. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?