Baer v. Salt Lake City Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Marlin Baer
Defendant: Salt Lake City Corporation, Larry Bowers, County of Salt Lake, Geno Garcia, Jefrery Seigal, Tenno Navarez, Don Hunsaker, Trenton Heintz and Iena Swanke
Case Number: 2:2013cv00336
Filed: May 13, 2013
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Referring Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2016 228 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-denying 227 Motion to Stay ; denying 227 Motion to Change Venue. Plaintiff is once again reminded that merely because the court has failed to rule in his favor, does not mean that the court is biased against him. Thus, to the extent that Plaintiffs filing again seeks recusal, that request is DENIED.See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/3/16. (jmr)
June 23, 2016 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 205 Motion to Compel. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/23/2016. (srs)
September 11, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motions for Reconsideration, Granting 54(b) Relief, and Adopting Report and Recommendation-denying 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to case; granting 64 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); denying 66 Motion to Vacate ; denying 68 Motion ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 74 Report and Recommendations.; denying 76 Motion for Summary Judgment and CERTIFIES its Order Adopting Report a nd Recommendation on April 25, 2014 (Dkt. No. 63) as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure with respect to the Courts Order dismissing Plaintiffs claims against the City Defendants. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/11/14. (jmr)
April 25, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying 34 Motion to Strike ; denying 40 Motion to Strike ; terminating 26 Motion for Summary Judgment ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 55 Report and Recommendations.; denying 20 Motion to Strike ; granting 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 4/24/14. (jmr)
December 3, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order- granting 33 Motion to Strike ; granting 38 Motion for Protective Order; denying 14 Motion to Vacate ; denying 14 Motion to Strike. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/3/13. (jmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baer v. Salt Lake City Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlin Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake City Corporation
Represented By: S. Spencer Brown
Represented By: Roger H. Bullock
Represented By: Darcy M. Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Bowers
Represented By: S. Spencer Brown
Represented By: Roger H. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Salt Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geno Garcia
Represented By: S. Spencer Brown
Represented By: Roger H. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefrery Seigal
Represented By: Darcy M. Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenno Navarez
Represented By: S. Spencer Brown
Represented By: Roger H. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Hunsaker
Represented By: S. Spencer Brown
Represented By: Roger H. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trenton Heintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iena Swanke
Represented By: S. Spencer Brown
Represented By: Roger H. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?