M.S. v. Utah School for the Deaf and the Blind
Plaintiff: M.S.
Defendant: Utah School for the Deaf and the Blind
Counter_claimant: Utah School for the Deaf and the Blind
Counter_defendant: M.S.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00420
Filed: June 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES TO PLAINTIFF-denying 136 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff shall be awarded attorneys fees in the amount of $162,043.18. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/26/17. (jmr)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 123 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff will be allowed to file a response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment within twenty-eight (28) days of this Order. Defendant may then file a reply memorandum within fourteen (14) days pursuant to DUCivR7-1(b)(3). Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/19/17. (jlw)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 92 Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Summary Judgment; denying 107 Defendant's Objection to Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Rule 56(d) Motion and in Response to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff will be allowed to file a response to Defendant's 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment within 28 days after the completion of discovery. Defendant may then file a reply memorandum within 14 days pursuant to DUCivR7-1(b)(3). When the Motion for Summary Judgment is fully briefed, the Court will set a hearing on the matter. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/9/2017. (eat)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying as moot 46 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/18/2014. (blh)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record; denying 26 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. Plaintiff's IEP team is directed to meet within 30 days of this Order to establish an updated IEP that is consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 8/25/14 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.S. v. Utah School for the Deaf and the Blind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.
Represented By: Chantel L. Alberhasky
Represented By: Erik Strindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah School for the Deaf and the Blind
Represented By: Kristina L. Kindl
Represented By: Kevin V. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Utah School for the Deaf and the Blind
Represented By: Kristina L. Kindl
Represented By: Kevin V. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: M.S.
Represented By: Chantel L. Alberhasky
Represented By: Erik Strindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?