Arnett v. Howard et al
Plaintiff: |
James Arnett |
Defendant: |
Benjamin Snow Howard, Lifeline Media LLC, Nationwide Affordable Housing and Ben Howard Trust |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00591 |
Filed: |
June 25, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Central Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Ted Stewart |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 12, 2015 |
Filing
107
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 105 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/12/2015. (blh)
|
July 16, 2014 |
Filing
90
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 83 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 85 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/16/2014. (blh)
|
March 21, 2014 |
Filing
82
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERdenying 57 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; denying 65 Motion for TRO; granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Withdraw and Motion to Amend Complaint. The Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint consistent with this Order, within thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/21/14. (ss)
|
October 29, 2013 |
Filing
81
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERdenying 60 Motion to Expedite Inquiry Regarding a Violation of 18 U.S.C. § 1512(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/29/13. (ss)
|
October 10, 2013 |
Filing
79
MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 69 Motion for Sanctions ; that the portion of the record referencing Plaintiffs mental health is stricken (doc. 64, p.4) and shall not be considered by the Court. Defendants Counsel is further ORDERED to re-file Defendants Response In Opposition To Plaintiffs Untitled Motion Filed On August 14, 2013 (doc. 64) with the offending portions of the submissionremoved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/09/2013. (asp)
|
June 24, 2013 |
Filing
49
ORDERED that defendants' 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim/ Motion to Dismiss is denied in part and granted in part. The Clerk's Office is directed to transfer this action to Utah in accordance with the Court's orde r. Further ordered denying 39 Motion to Consolidate Cases. It is ordered that Magistrate Judge Ferraro's 47 Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted by this Court as the findings of fact and conclusions of law. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 6/24/2013.(BAR) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/25/2013.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?