Williams v. Utah Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Emmanuel Williams
Defendant: Utah Department of Corrections, Craig Burr, Devon Blood, A. Shane Nelson, Rollin Cook, Kelly Swallows, FNU Gehre and FNU Winget
Case Number: 2:2013cv00601
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Sanpete
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Shelby
Nature of Suit: Prison Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Memorandum Decision and Dismissal Order: It is ordered that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 11/26/2019. (kpf)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER GRANTING IN PART STATE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: 1. Summary judgment is GRANTED as to defendants swallow and Chipp, who are DISMISSED from this case with prejudice. 2. The summary judgment mot ion remains PENDING as to Defendants Blood, Nelson, and Burr. 3. The Court's prior Orders denying Plaintiffs motion for appointed counsel are VACATED (see docket entry 13 & 74), and the motions are now GRANTED (see docket entry 6, 65, and 68).4. The Clerk of Court must secure pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at this time in a limited capacity. 5. Counsel shall enter an appearance with fourteen days of appointment. 6. The Scope of this pro bono appointment is limited to assisting Plai ntiff. See order for details. 7. The scope of the limited appearance does note extend beyond these specific tasks. 8. When the purpose of this appointment has been completed, counsel is directed to file a Notice of Fulfillment of Limited Appointed. 9 . Within ninety days of entering appearance of counsel, Plaintiffs counsel shall file an amended response to the summary judgment motion still pending as to Defendants Blood, Nelson and Burr only. 10. Plaintiff must not file any more pleadings in this case before consulting his attorney. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 09/27/2017. (kpf)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DENYING UTAH DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTS DEFENDANTS' SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION: denying 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 84 Motion to Strike Correspondence; denying 98 Motion for Summary Ju dgment, The Court concludes that Defendants neither defrauded the Court nor perjured themselves with a mistaken copy of the policy on religious meetings; denying 102 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. Defendants must within 90 days file a Martinez re port addressing the merits of Plaintiff's claims. When served with a Martinez report, Plaintiff may submit a response within 30 days of the report's filing date. Defendants must within 120 days file a summary judgment motion. When served with a summary judgment motion, Plaintiff must submit a response within 30 days of the motion's filing date. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 09/27/2016. (kpf)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 48 Millard County Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action; denying 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Millard County Defendants (Gehre and Winget) are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/29/2016. (eat)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS: It is hereby Ordered that: Denying 37 Motion for copies; Denying 57 Motion for copies; Within twenty days, Defendants Gehr and Winget (Millard County D efendants) shall file with the Court a proposed order-based on their motion for summary judgment. The proposed order shall be prepared in Times New Romand font an otherwise comply with Court rules. Respondent shall file proposed order in the EM/ECF s ystem using the Notice of Filing event and submit the proposed order in word processing format to: utdecf_prisonerlitigationunit@utd.uscourts.gov. See order for details. Denying 65 Motion to Appoint Counsel, The Clerk of Court shall take note that no further motions for appointed counsel will be accepted; Denying 68 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Granting 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 2/10/2016. (kpf)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER; The Court has directed the United States Marshals Service to serve process in this case. See order for details. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/27/2015. (kpf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Utah Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Emmanuel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Burr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Blood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Shane Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rollin Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Swallows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Gehre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Winget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?