Mglej v. Garfield County et al

Plaintiff: Matthew T. Mglej
Defendant: Garfield County, Garfield County Sheriff's Office, Garfield County Jail and Raymond Gardner
Case Number: 2:2013cv00713
Filed: July 29, 2013
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Garfield
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2016 125 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 108 Motion to Disqualify Judge. ; granting 115 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 115 Motion to Stay ; granting 120 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J. Tayler Fox and Carolyn Mont gomery withdrawn from case for Plaintiff. ; granting 120 Motion to Stay. Based on the withdrawal of counsel and the Courts decision to appoint new pro bono counsel, the Court will also grant the request to stay briefing on Defendants Motion for S ummary Judgment.20 The Court understands Defendants frustrations with the delays that have occurred in this case. However, new counsel will need sufficient time to review discovery and respond to Defendants Motion. Therefore, the Court will allow Pla intiffs newly appointed counsel to respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment within 90 days of their appearance.The Clerk of Court is directed to locate new pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff. New counsel shall have 90 days from the date of their appearance to respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/17/16. (jlw)
December 11, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 57 Motion to Quash; denying 57 Motion to Modify Defendants Motion for Deposition and Request for Documents; granting 59 Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff; granting 59 Motion to Expedite Deposition of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/11/2014. (jwt)
July 1, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-granting 23 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and DISMISSES all of Plaintiff Matthew Mglejs state law claims (Claims Six through Thirteen). Pursuant to Utah Code Ann. § 78B-3-104 and § 63G-7-601, the court awards attorneys fees and costs to Defendants for defense against the state law causes of action. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 7/1/14. (jmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mglej v. Garfield County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew T. Mglej
Represented By: Clay A. Alger
Represented By: Robert T. Spjute
Represented By: Michael C. Van
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?