Rohwedder v. Unified Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Billy L. Rohwedder
Defendant: Unified Police Department, West Jordan Police Department and FNU Brown
Case Number: 2:2013cv00750
Filed: August 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: It is hereby ordered that: If UPD is unable to accept service of process for the defendant identified above, UPD shall disclose to the USMS any information in its records that may help in identifying, locating and completing service of process upon the named defendant. See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/14/2015. (kpf)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER; It is hereby ordered: Plaintiff shall have THIRTY DAYS from the date of this order to cure the deficiencies noted. The Clerks Office shall mail a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide. If Plaintiffs fails to timely cure the above deficiencies according to the instructions here this action will be dismissed without further notice. denying 16 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). First. The Second Amended Complaint has been deemed deficient, and therefore, not worthy of service. See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 4/7/2015. (kpf)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION directing Plaintiff to file a second amended complaint to cure deficiencies; denying 9 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/5/15 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rohwedder v. Unified Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy L. Rohwedder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Jordan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?