Swasey et al v. West Valley City et al

Plaintiff: Danielle Swasey, Dante Ketchens, D. S. and D. K.
Defendant: West Valley City, Shaun Cowley, Kevin Salmon, Sean McCarthy, John Coyle and Thayle Nielsen
Case Number: 2:2013cv00768
Filed: August 14, 2013
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2016 174 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER overruling objection and affirming Magistrate Judge's 154 Order. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/18/16 (alt)
March 16, 2016 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time; granting in part 107 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 3/16/15 (alt)
February 3, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 96 Motion for Protective Order; denying 99 Motion for Protective Order; denying 100 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 2/3/16 (alt)
January 15, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 69 Motion to Quash; denying without prejudice 71 Motion to Quash; denying without prejudice 91 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 1/14/16 (alt)
December 1, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 82 Motion for Award of Costs. Privilege log is to be produced within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/30/15 (alt)
November 10, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Directing Filing of Privilege Logs; taking under advisement 69 Motion to Quash; taking under advisement 71 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/10/15 (alt)
June 16, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 49 Motion to Strike Certain Statements from 44 Amended Complaint: The references to Officer Valdes which appear in paragraph 12 are stricken from the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 6/16/15 (alt)
February 5, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION ADN ORDER granting 21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings: Plaintiffs' second cause of action against Coyle is dismissed with prejudice and state law claims against Coyle are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs have 21 days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint and pay the required undertaking. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 2/5/15 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swasey et al v. West Valley City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Swasey
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Shelley L. Kaufman
Represented By: Jon D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante Ketchens
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Shelley L. Kaufman
Represented By: Jon D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. S.
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Shelley L. Kaufman
Represented By: Jon D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. K.
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Shelley L. Kaufman
Represented By: Jon D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Valley City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Cowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thayle Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?