Vitamins Online v. Heartwise et al
Plaintiff: Vitamins Online
Defendant: Heartwise and DavidPaul Doyle
Case Number: 2:2013cv00982
Filed: October 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 585 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW denying Defendant's 556 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/10/2020. (eat)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 530 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 483 Motion in Limine No. 1; granting 484 Motion in Limine No. 2; denying 485 Motion in Limine No. 3; denying 486 Motion in Limine No. 4; and granting in part and denying in part [487 ] Motion in Limine No. 5. Moreover, the court resolves the parties' objections as described herein. And, finally, the parties are to ensure their preparation as the court will move forward with trial, beginning July 16, 2020, whether in person or via videoconference technology. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6/24/2020. (eat)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 213 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/17/17. (dla)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 159 Defendant HeartWise's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/19/2016. (eat)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 178 Heartwise's Rule 72 Objection to two orders issued by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Orders 155 and 177 ). The court does not consider any part of Judge Warner's orders to be clearly erroneous or contrary to law and affirms his rulings in both orders. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/11/2016. (eat)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 55 Motion to Compel; granting 76 Motion to Take Deposition from Richard Meirowitz; granting 97 Motion for Sanctions. See Memorandum Decision and Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/31/2016. (srs)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 66 Motion to Strike; denying 52 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Willful False Advertising; denying 74 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment, but denied Without Prejudice re the Amazon Review Claims; granting 100 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2/9/2016. (eat)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 68 Motion to Strike; denying 69 Motion to Expedite. Deadlines for responding to Heartwise's Motion to Strike 66 are set forth in the Order. Heartwise is directed to file redacted, public versio ns of any memorandum that has been filed under seal and to provide a courtesy copy to chambers of Docket 73 (which is the same as Docket 74 ). The court has clarified which motions will be heard on January 27, 2016 and which motions will be decided by Magistrate Judge Warner. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 12/21/2015. (eat)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vitamins Online v. Heartwise et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vitamins Online
Represented By: Chad E. Nydegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartwise
Represented By: Brian C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DavidPaul Doyle
Represented By: Brian C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?