Lifevantage v. Domingo et al

Plaintiff: Lifevantage
Defendant: Jason Domingo and Ovation Marketing Group
Case Number: 2:2013cv01037
Filed: November 19, 2013
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2016 302 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/22/16. (jlw)
September 8, 2016 297 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION Granting in Part and Denying in Part 190 LifeVantage's Motion for Summary Judgment, Granting in Part and Denying in Part 192 Mr. Domingo's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Judicial Proceedings P rivilege, and Granting 195 Mr. Domingo's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Misappropriation of Trade Secrets. The court holds that Mr. Domingo materially breached his Agreement with LifeVantage on November 4, 2013. But there are disputed facts with respect to the other alleged breaches. Additionally, the court holds that Mr. Domingo has not demonstrated that LifeVantage tortuously interfered with any prospective economic relationship. The court holds that the conference calls are not protected by the judicial proceedings privilege but that there are disputed facts with respect to whether the immunity applies to other allegedly defamatory statements. The court also finds that LifeVantage has not demonstrated any damages caused by Mr. Domingos alleged misappropriation of trade secrets. See order for further details. Dated this 8th day of September, 2016 by Judge Jill Parrish.(jlw)
March 9, 2016 264 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/9/16 (alt)
February 12, 2016 237 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 116 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/12/16 (alt)
September 29, 2015 170 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and order denying 49 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/29/15. (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lifevantage v. Domingo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifevantage
Represented By: Timothy M. Considine
Represented By: Christopher M. Glauser
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Domingo
Represented By: Arthur B. Berger
Represented By: Samuel C. Straight
Represented By: Justin T. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ovation Marketing Group
Represented By: Arthur B. Berger
Represented By: Samuel C. Straight
Represented By: Justin T. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?