VidAngel LLC v. Clearplay, Inc.
Plaintiff: VidAngel LLC
Defendant: Clearplay, Inc.
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Clearplay, Inc.
Thirdparty_defendant: Jeffrey Harmon and Neal Harmon
Counter_claimant: Clearplay, Inc., Neal Harmon and Jeffrey Harmon
Counter_defendant: VidAngel LLC and Clearplay, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00160
Filed: March 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Granting 178 Joint Motion to Withdraw Reference Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 157(d). Signed by Judge David Barlow on 04/20/2021. (jl)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERgranting 163 Motion for Status Conference; denying without prejudice 165 Motion to Compel; continuing stay of proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 10/12/17 (alt)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 148 Motion to Stay for until a decision is rendered on the preliminary injunction by the Ninth Circuit; denying 151 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 3/31/17 (alt)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE DISTRICT OF UTAH 37 21 27 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/4/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/5/2014.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VidAngel LLC v. Clearplay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VidAngel LLC
Represented By: Clinton E. Duke
Represented By: Enoch H. Liang
Represented By: Matthew J. Orme
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearplay, Inc.
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Brian D. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Clearplay, Inc.
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Brian D. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Jeffrey Harmon
Represented By: Clinton E. Duke
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Neal Harmon
Represented By: Clinton E. Duke
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Clearplay, Inc.
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Brian D. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Neal Harmon
Represented By: Matthew J. Orme
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jeffrey Harmon
Represented By: Clinton E. Duke
Represented By: Matthew J. Orme
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: VidAngel LLC
Represented By: Clinton E. Duke
Represented By: Enoch H. Liang
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Clearplay, Inc.
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Brian D. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?