One Man Band Corporation et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: One Man Band Corporation and Bradley G. Turner
Defendant: Jeff Smith and Jeff W & Loretta J Smith LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv00221
Filed: March 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B. Pead
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Denying 77 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion Under URCP 64A. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/13/17. (dla)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will set a trial date to resolve the remaining claims. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/23/2017. (eat)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying as moot 48 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award; granting 55 Motion to Confirm Final Arbitration Award - the Final Arbitration Award is CONFIRMED; denying 64 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Property to One Man Band Corporation. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/21/2016. (eat)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: One Man Band Corporation et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: One Man Band Corporation
Represented By: Nelson T. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley G. Turner
Represented By: Nelson T. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff W & Loretta J Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?