Nunes v. Rushton

Plaintiff: Rachel Ann Nunes
Defendant: Tiffanie Rushton
Case Number: 2:2014cv00627
Filed: August 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J. Furse
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERgranting in part and denying in part 289 Nunes's motion to exclude evidence of Rushton's finances under Rules 26 and 37. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/14/2018. (jds) Modified on 5/14/2018 (jds).
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - granting 172 Rushtons Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 218 Nuness Motion for Summary Judgment on the copyright infringement claim; denying 228 Nuness mo tion for summary judgment on the defamation claims; denying 229 Nuness motion for summary judgment on the electronic communication harassment claim; denying 230 Nuness motion for summary judgment on the false advertising claims ; denying 231 Nuness motion for summary judgment on the tortious interference claim; denying 160 Nuness motion for summary judgment on what it labels as Rushtons insanity defense ; granting 161 Nuness motion for summary judgment on Rushtons affirmative defe nses of comparative fault, estoppel, laches, unclean hands, and failure to mitigate damages; denying as moot 159 Rushtons motion in limine to exclude the testimony of Bruce Webster; denying as moot 168 Rushtons motion in limine to exclude the testimony of Josi Kilpack; denying as moot 169 Rushtons motion in limine to exclude the testimony of Heather Moore; denying as moot 170 Rushtons motion in limine to exclude the testimony of Heather Moore and Josi Kilpack for violations of a protective order; denying as moot 171 Rushtons motion in limine to exclude the testimony of Scott Bosworth. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 3/9/2018. (jds)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 40 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 41 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/18/15 (alt)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 29 Motion for Sanctions; denying 32 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/4/15 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunes v. Rushton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Ann Nunes
Represented By: Clinton E. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffanie Rushton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?