Diamond Ranch Academy v. Filer
Plaintiff: Diamond Ranch Academy
Defendant: Chelsea Filer
Case Number: 2:2014cv00751
Filed: October 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 2/17/16 (alt)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 39 Motion to Stay; denying 40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Briefing schedule set as to 32 MOTION to Strike and Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2015 at 10:00 AM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Tena Campbell. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/15/15 (alt)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: Defendants opposition to 39 Motion to Stay Briefing is due no later than 6/23/15. Plaintiff may file reply memo no later than 7/7/15. Discovery schedule or deadlines for filing briefs will be set after the court rules on 39 Motion. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 6/9/15 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Ranch Academy v. Filer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Ranch Academy
Represented By: Steven R. Bangerter
Represented By: William E. Frazier
Represented By: Daniel P. Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Filer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?