Strong v. Cochran et al
Plaintiff: D. Ray Strong
Defendant: Kirby D. Cochran, Jeff Austin, Austin Capital Solutions, William H. Davidson, Douglas W. Child, Child Van Wagoner & Associates, Robert Clawson and Hybrid Advisor Group
Case Number: 2:2014cv00788
Filed: October 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 392 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 225 Mr. Geringer's motion for partial summary judgment. The parties are ordered to file a motion to amend the scheduling order within fourteen days. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 7/16/2020. (jds)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER; granting in part and denying in part motions 347 Mr. Geringer's motion for clarification, 346 Mr. Geringer's motion for reconsideration, 349 Mr. Austin's motion to join the motions for clarification and reconsideration, and 350 Mr. Davidson's motion for reconsideration and clarification. Denying 367 Mr. Geringer's motion for discovery under Rule 56(d) and denying 337 Mr. Strong's motion for bifurcation. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/30/2019. (jds)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 221 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 244 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claim Nos. 1, 2, 4, 8, and 9, but reserving ruling as to Claim No. 5. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/23/19 (alt)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 258 Motion To Allow Untimely Response re 221 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Second Claim for Relief); denying 255 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 260 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 8/27/18 (alt)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 107 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 115 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 116 Motion for Judicial Notice; denying 111 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/13/17 (alt)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 111 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/9/17 (alt)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 118 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/4/17 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong v. Cochran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. Ray Strong
Represented By: Peggy Hunt
Represented By: Milo Steven Marsden
Represented By: Nathan S. Seim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby D. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Capital Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas W. Child
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Child Van Wagoner & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Clawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hybrid Advisor Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?