Jessup v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Jack Jessup
Defendant: Sydney Roberts, Chad Dufford, FNU Umbrell and Mark Mook
Case Number: 2:2014cv00829
Filed: November 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM DECISION and DISMISSAL ORDER: It is therefore ordered that, because he has failed to prosecute his case, Plaintiffs complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 04/13/2017. (kpf)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE OF PROCESS. It is hereby ordered that USMS shall serve a completed summons, a copy of the Second Amended Complaint and a copy of this Order upon the above listed defendants. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 5/3/2016. (kpf)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER & MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 22 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner); granting 24 Motion to Amend; Plaintiff must within thirty days cure the Amended Complaints deficiencies n oted above. The Clerk's Office shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide with a form complaint should he choose to file an amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the above deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action will be dismissed without further notice. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/22/16. (jlw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jessup v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Jessup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Dufford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Umbrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Mook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?