Friends of Tuhaye, LLC v. Tuhaye Homeowners Association

Plaintiff: Friends of Tuhaye, LLC
Defendant: Tuhaye Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2014cv00901
Filed: December 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dustin B. Pead
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 128 Motion to Stay Execution of Balance Judgment during the pendency of plaintiff's appeal conditional on posting of bond; Plaintiff is ordered to post a supersedeas bond in the amount of $160,000.00 within 5 business days. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/10/18 (alt)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 105 Motion for Award of Damages and Adjudication of Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/29/18 (alt)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 65 Motion for Summary Judgment: all claims by plaintiff Friends of Tuhaye against Tuhaye HOA are dismissed. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 6/7/17 (alt)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting JRAT Investments' 42 Motion to Intervene. COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: The Intervenor Complaint must be filed conventionally. Please include a disk with the complaint and any exhibits in PDF format. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/15/16 (alt)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that Defendant's 5 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice or in the Alternative, to transfer Venue is Granted in part as to transfer of venue, and Denied in part as to dismissal. The Court Orders the Clerk to transfer this matter to the United States District Court, District of Utah for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/10/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Tuhaye, LLC v. Tuhaye Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Tuhaye, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuhaye Homeowners Association
Represented By: Douglas C. Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?