Wood v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Brian L. Wood
Defendant: Doug Cook and FNU Tubbs
Case Number: 2:2015cv00071
Filed: February 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Bruce S. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Prison Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION granting 78 Motion for Summary Judgment. This action is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 03/18/2019. (kpf)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER GRANTING MEDICAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Granting 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 03/22/2018. (kpf)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting & Denying in Part 44 Defendant Cook's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Cook's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The only const itutional claim remaining against Defendant Cook in this case is that the fines he assessed were excessive. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within sixty days Defendant Cook must file a motion for summary judgment on the excessive-fine claim. Plaintiff will then have thirty days to respond. For Plaintiff's information and convenience, the Court has attached the procedural rules governing summary-judgment practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/9/18. (dla)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM DECISION & DISMISSAL ORDER: It is therefore ordered that, because Plaintiff has failed to prosecute this case, Plaintiffs action is DISMISSED without prejudice. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 09/20/2017. (kpf)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM DECISION and DISMISSAL ORDER: It is therefore ordered that, because he has failed to prosecute his case, Plaintiffs complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 04/17/2017. (kpf)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER: It is hereby ordered that: If the State is unable to accept service of process for the defendants identified above, the State shall disclose to the USMS any information in its records that may help in identifying, locating completing service of process upon the named defendants. See order for details. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 2/4/2016. (kpf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian L. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Tubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?