Mrs. Fields Franchising v. MFGPC
Plaintiff: |
Mrs. Fields Franchising |
Defendant: |
MFGPC |
Cross_defendant: |
Mrs. Fields Famous Brands and Mrs. Fields Confections |
Counter_claimant: |
MFGPC |
Counter_defendant: |
Mrs. Fields Confections, Mrs. Fields Famous Brands and Mrs. Fields Franchising |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00094 |
Filed: |
February 10, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Central Office |
County: |
Salt Lake |
Presiding Judge: |
Dee Benson |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 2, 2021 |
Filing
321
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying Mrs. Fields' 309 Motion for Attorney Fees; and granting in part MFGPC's 311 Motion for Attorney Fees. The court ORDERS Mrs. Fields to pay MFGPC's requested fees in the amount of $810,476.85. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/2/2021. (eat)
|
August 26, 2021 |
Filing
307
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - The court orders Mrs. Fields to pay MFGPC $111,133 in lost profit damages plus $41,132 for unpaid invoices. In total, Mrs. Fields owes MFGPC $152,265. Interest will continue to accrue on the judgment until paid in full at the legal rate established under Utah Code § 15-1-1. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/26/2021. (eat)
|
June 9, 2021 |
Filing
283
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting Motions in Limine No. 1 and 2 (Docket Entries 262 and 263 ), and denying Motions in Limine No. 3 and 4 (Docket Entries 264 and 265 ). Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6/9/2021. (eat)
|
June 30, 2020 |
Filing
256
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part MFGPC's 253 Motion to Compel. MFGPC's request for fees is granted under Rule 37 and MFGPC is to file an affidavit concerning costs within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Mrs. Fields may then file an objection, if needed, to MFGPC's affidavit within seven (7) days from its filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/30/2020. (eat)
|
February 4, 2020 |
Filing
250
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part MFGPC's 243 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2/4/2020. (eat)
|
April 5, 2019 |
Filing
200
ORDER granting 183 Motion for Joinder of Perfect Snax Prime; finding as moot 185 Motion for Clarification on Whether to Permit Joinder of Perfect Snax Prime, LLC as Counterclaim Defendant re 183 MOTION for Joinder of Mrs. Fie lds Famous Brands and Perfect Snax Prime, LLC as Counterclaim Defendants. MFGPC is HEREBY ORDERED to file an Amended Counterclaim that comports with the courts orders regarding the Motion to Amend (ECF Nos. 171 and 184 ) within SEVEN DAYS of this Order. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/5/2019. (jwt)
|
March 20, 2019 |
Filing
188
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 147 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 3/19/2019. (jds)
|
January 8, 2019 |
Filing
171
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting in Part 139 MFGPC's Motion to Amend and Ordering Supplemental Briefing: The court grants MFGPC leave to file an amended counterclaim and crossclaim/third-party complaint adding claims for injunctive and declaratory relief. But the court reserves judgment on whether MFGPC may add the Doe Defendants and whether MFGPC may revise the case caption. Within TEN DAYS of this Order, MFGPC shall file a supplemental memorandum of no more than 5 pages specifying whether the claims against Famous Brands and the proposed claims against Doe Defendants, are crossclaim or third-party claims. MFGPC may also move to cure the joinder of Famous Brands. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of Famous Brands for improper joinder. Within seven days of the court's ruling on the motion to revise the case caption, MFGPC shall file its amended complaint. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/8/19. (dla)
|
August 20, 2018 |
Filing
132
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting MFGPC's Motion for Summary Judgment: MFGPC's Motion for Summary Judgment 120 is GRANTED IN PART. The only issue that remains is damages. Mrs. Fields' Motion for Summary Judgmen t 99 is DENIED. MFGPC is instructed to inform the court within seven days of the date of this order whether it still seeks leave to amend. The remaining motions - MFGPC's Motion Under Rule 56(d) to Defer or Deny Consideration of Defendants 9; Motion for Summary Judgment 102 and MFGPC's Request for a Status and Scheduling Conference 103 - are DENIED AS MOOT. The parties are hereby ORDERED to meet and confer so that they can propose a schedule for discovery and motions related to the issue of damages. The parties shall propose a scheduling order within fourteen days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/20/18. (dla)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?