September 3, 2019 |
Filing
890
ORDER on Motions in Limine - reserves ruling on 669 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 670 Motion in Limine; denying 671 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 672 Motion in Limine; denying 673 Motion in Limine; denying 674 Motion in Limine; denying 677 Motion in Limine; denying 678 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 681 Motion in Limine; denying 684 Motion in Limine; granting 690 Motion in Limine; granting 693 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 698 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 699 Motion in Limine; granting 708 Motion in Limine; granting 847 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/3/2019. (jwt)
|
August 28, 2019 |
Filing
869
MEMORANDUM DECISION & Order granting 569 Motion for Sanctions. The court imposes attorney- fee sanctions upon Yardi in the amount of $1,938,565 plus fees and costs associated with Entrata's Motion. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 08/28/2019. (kpf)
|
March 28, 2019 |
Filing
560
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING ENTRATA, INC.'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO STRIKE YARDI'S SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS IN PART-granting in part 456 Motion to Strike. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/28/19. (jmr)
|
February 26, 2019 |
Filing
492
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON ENTRATA, INC'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO STRIKE YARDI'S SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS- re 456 Emergency MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support (Redacted), Set Deadlines as to 456 Emergency MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support (Redacted).( Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2019 at 03:30 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups.) See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/26/19. (jmr)
|
February 5, 2019 |
Filing
454
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 446 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/4/19. (jlw)
|
January 3, 2019 |
Filing
441
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING 435 Defendant's Objection to 425 Special Master's Second Order. The court DENIES Yardi's Objection as to all five documents. Yardi shall produce to Entrata, or or before January 4, 2019 the five documents the Special Master originally ordered to be produced. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/3/19. (jlw)
|
November 26, 2018 |
Filing
424
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-denying 381 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/26/18. (jmr)
|
October 29, 2018 |
Filing
405
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S RULE 72(a) OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER - the court DENIES Yardis Objection 303 . The court declines to award Entrata its fees and costs. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/29/18. (jmr)
|
October 11, 2018 |
Filing
380
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-granting in part and denying in part 248 Motion for Short Term Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 248 Motion to Expedite; denying 300 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 10/11/18. (jmr)
|
August 30, 2018 |
Filing
348
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING ENTRATAS MOTION FOR SPECIAL MASTER-The court orders in camera review by a special master of all documents Yardi continues to withhold or redact as privileged. Because the court has concluded that Yardi has withheld documents that are not actually privileged, Yardi shall pay for the cost of this review. Yardi's request to have the special master review Entratas privilege log is DENIED because Yardi hasnot come forward with a basis to justify that request. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 8/30/18. (jmr)
|
June 20, 2018 |
Filing
287
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 213 Motion for Short Term Discovery; denying 213 Motion for Protective Order; denying 214 Motion for Short Term Discovery; denying 214 Motion for Protective Order; denying 229 Motion for Protective Order; denying 237 Motion for Short Term Discovery; denying 241 Motion to Compel; denying 237 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/20/2018. (jwt)
|
May 4, 2018 |
Filing
212
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-granting 171 Motion for Short Term Discovery; finding as moot 191 Motion for Protective Order; denying 192 Motion for Short Term Discovery; denying 193 Motion for Short Term Discovery. Yardi shall produce any yCRM data that is responsive to Entratas requests for production within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/4/18. (jmr)
|
November 17, 2017 |
Filing
162
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: granting 149 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order - Discovery due by 9/7/2018, Motions due by 9/14/2018. Denying 126 Plaintiffs short form discovery motion on Request for Production Nos. 41-42; Denyin g 129 Plaintiffs short form discovery motion on Defendants September 29, 2017 document production; Granting in part and denying in part 132 Plaintiffs short form discovery motion on Interrogatory Nos. 34-36; denying 133 Plaintiffs short form discovery motion on Interrogatory Nos. 41-42; Denying 147 Plaintiffs short form discovery motion on Defendants alleged violation of the October 12, 2017 order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/17/2017. (jds)
|
September 20, 2017 |
Filing
123
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 105 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery; denying 106 Defendant's Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/20/17. (jlw)
|
April 8, 2016 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND Order-granting 36 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint within ten (10) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 4/7/16. (jmr)
|