Dutcher v. Bold Films et al
Plaintiff: |
Richard Dutcher |
Defendant: |
Bold Films, Bold Film Productions, Open Road Films and NBC Universal Media |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00110 |
Filed: |
February 19, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Central Office |
County: |
Salt Lake |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Kimball |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyrights |
Cause of Action: |
17 U.S.C. § 0101 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 23, 2020 |
Filing
394
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 370 Motion to Seal Document re 371 Sealed Document and denying 377 Motion for Protective Order re: internal billing records. If Defendants do not file objections to this order within the 14-day period provided the Clerk of Court shall unseal Exhibit A immediately after expiration of that 14-day period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/23/2020. (jds)
|
August 19, 2019 |
Filing
359
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER following 347 ORDER. The court grants Defendants Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony or Other Evidence Re: Substantial Similarity as to Non-Protected Elements of Falling 295 and reconsiders its previous denial of summary judgment based on substantialsimilarity. Summary judgment is hereby GRANTED in favor of Defendants. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/19/2019. (jds)
|
January 11, 2019 |
Filing
278
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERdenying 150 Motion to Determine Daubert Issues; denying 151 Motion to Determine Daubert Issues; denying 157 Motion in Limine Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/11/2019. (mas)
|
November 8, 2018 |
Filing
261
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 244 Motion to Lift Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that All deadlines in the current pretrial scheduling order are VACATED. The final pretrial conference scheduled for November 15, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. and the ten-day jury trial scheduled for December 3, 2018, at 8:30 a.m. are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/8/2018. (mas)
|
August 13, 2018 |
Filing
239
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 139 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 148 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 155 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, except with respect to Defendants 11th, 12th, 13th, 14th, 15th, and 16th Affirmative Defenses, as to which stipulated dismissal is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections 229 are OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/13/2018. (mas)
|
May 8, 2017 |
Filing
114
ORDER denying 100 Motion to Compel; denying 101 Motion to Compel; denying 106 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/8/2017. (srs)
|
November 28, 2016 |
Filing
103
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER and AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Discovery due by 4/17/2017. Motions due by 5/30/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2017 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. 5 Day Jury Trial set for 10/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/28/2016. (blh)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?