Bacon v. Winder et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael A. Bacon |
Defendant: |
James M. Winder, Todd R. Wilcox, Brad Lewis and Eric Lindley |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00145 |
Filed: |
March 4, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Central Office |
County: |
Salt Lake |
Presiding Judge: |
Bruce S. Jenkins |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 15, 2019 |
Filing
96
MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER DENYING MOTIONTO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's post-judgment motion is DENIED. 94 This action remains closed. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/15/19. (jmr)
|
September 25, 2019 |
Filing
92
MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: granting 72 Motion for Summary Judgment. This action is dimissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 09/25/2019. (kpf)
|
May 7, 2018 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM DECISION & THIRD ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS: The United States Marshals Service is again directed to serve a properly issued summons and a copy of Plaintiff's amended complaint, along with this Order, up the following Salt Lake County related defendants: Patrick Gee and Deputy Backman. Denying 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel. NO FURTHER MOTIONS OF THIS NATURE WILL BE ACCEPTED HERE; Granting 46 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Granting 47 Motion to Quash; Denying 53 Motion to Strike; Denying 54 Motion to Strike; Denying 58 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Denying 59 Motion for Default Judgment. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 05/07/2018. (kpf)
|
February 9, 2018 |
Filing
40
MEMORANDUM DECISION & SECOND ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS. The United States Marshals Service is again directed to serve properly issued summons and a copy of the Plaintiffs Amended Complaint along with this order, upon the following Salt Lake County related defendants: Todd R. Wilcox, Brad Lewis, Eric Lindley, Patrick Gee and Deputy Backman. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/09/2018. (kpf)
|
February 15, 2017 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT & ORDERING SERVICE ON REMAINING DEFENDANTS. Granting 32 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). The United States Marshals Service shall serve a summons, a copy of Plaintiffs complaint, and a copy of this Order upon Defendants FNU Backman, Patrick Gee, Brad Lewis, Eric Lindley, Todd R. Wilcox. Defendant Denerio is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/15/2017. (kpf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?