Golden et al v. Mentor Capital et al
Plaintiff: |
Gena Golden and Susan Golden |
Defendant: |
Mentor Capital, Labertew & Associates and Michael L. Labertew |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00176 |
Filed: |
March 19, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Central Office |
County: |
Salt Lake |
Presiding Judge: |
Tena Campbell |
Nature of Suit: |
Stockholders Suits |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 0077 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 25, 2018 |
Filing
158
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - GRANTING 152 Plaintiffs Rule 41 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice and for Stay of Summary Judgment Briefing; Mentors request that it be declared a prevailing party is DENIED; DENIED as moot 131 Men tors Motion for Reconsideration, 150 Mentors Motion for Summary Judgment, and 151 Defendant Labertew & Associates and Michael L. Labertews Motion for Summary Judgment; The court VACATES 124 Memorandum Decision & Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. A separate order will issue addressing Mentors third-party claims. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/25/2018. (jds)
|
November 29, 2017 |
Filing
146
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting 140 Motion for Second Extension. Dispositive motions due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/29/17. (dla)
|
October 13, 2017 |
Filing
129
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting 127 Motion to Stay. Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay the discovery order is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 10/13/17. (dla)
|
September 25, 2017 |
Filing
124
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting 70 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of their Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/22/17. (dla)
|
September 5, 2017 |
Filing
120
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 108 Mentor's Motion to Compel Complete Discovery Responses from Gena and Susan Golden; granting 109 Mentor's Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses from Richard Golden. Mentor's request for costs and fees in bringing the respective motions is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 9/5/2017. (blh)
|
August 18, 2017 |
Filing
119
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 113 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Lift the Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the temporary stay of discovery as to Mr. Van Rixel is lifted and the discovery requests served in April 2017 are reinstated. Mr. Van Rixel is given fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to respond to the discovery request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 8/18/17. (jlw)
|
August 3, 2017 |
Filing
110
MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 79 Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint for insufficient service of process. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/3/17. (jlw)
|
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
107
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 97 Motion to Quash and to stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 07/12/17. (jlw)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing
105
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part 93 Motion to Compel. The court will award $1040.25 in costs and fees. The court discounts the amount by half giving credit to Plaintiffs for some cooperation in the discovery process given their health challenges.Defendants are ORDERED to provide the court and Plaintiffs with an affidavit of costs and fees associated with bringing this motion within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Upon receipt, Plaintiffs will have fourteen (14) days to pay the required amount of costs and fees to Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 6/1/17. (jlw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?