Bacilio v. Utah Department of Corrections Board and Parole Members et al
Plaintiff: |
Miguel Angel Bacilio |
Defendant: |
Utah Department of Corrections Board and Parole Members, Curtis L. Garner, Angela Micklos, Jesse Gallegos, Robert S. Yates, James A. Valdez and Vernice Trease |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00233 |
Filed: |
April 6, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Central Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Clark Waddoups |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 2, 2018 |
Filing
41
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-finding as moot 39 Motion for Discovery; denying 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; Motions terminated: 39 MOTION for Discovery filed by Miguel Angel Bacilio, 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by S. Russell, B. Varoz, Curtis L. Garner.; S. Russell (Case Analyst ) and B. Varoz (Hearing Officer at Board of Pardons and Paroles ) terminated. See Order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/2/18. (jmr)
|
April 24, 2018 |
Filing
37
MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 35 Notice of Filing Dismissal (Responses due by 5/15/2018); Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 04/24/2018. (kpf)
|
July 18, 2017 |
Filing
16
MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: It is hereby ordered that: If the State or country is unable to accept service of process for the defendant identified above, the State or county shall disclose to the USMS any information in its records that may help in identifying, locating and completing service of process upon the named defendant. See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 07/17/2017. (kpf)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: Plaintiff must within thirty days cure the Complaint's deficiencies noted above. The Clerk's Office shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide with a form complaint and habeas peti tion for Plaintiff to use should he choose to file another amended complaint or a habeas corpus petition. If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the above deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 04/25/2017. (kpf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?