Tanne et al v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: James S. Tanne and Megan M. Tanne
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2015cv00296
Filed: April 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Shelby
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:7402 Refund of Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER adopting in part and overruling in part 66 Report and Recommendations, and denying Plaintiffs' 63 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Claim. Because no other claims remain, the Clerk of Court is ordered to close the case. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 2/12/2018. (eat)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; adopting 41 Report and Recommendations.; granting 12 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 13 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 21 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs Objection 48 is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/21/2016. (jds)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying 4 MOTION to accept the complaint as filed with the date of the postmark of the original envelope ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 26 , and deems Mr. and Mrs. Tannes Complaint filed on April 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/29/2016. (jds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanne et al v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S. Tanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan M. Tanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?