Federal Election Commission v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Federal Election Commission
Defendant: Jeremy David Johnson and John Swallow
Respondent: Ronald J. Yengich
Case Number: 2:2015cv00439
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 52:30116
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 165 CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/19/20. (dla)
August 3, 2020 Filing 164 Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Consent Judgment)(Siler, Jacob)
June 15, 2020 Filing 163 NOTICE of Restoration of Quorum by Federal Election Commission (Kilfoyle, Tara)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #160 Stipulated Motion to Stay and all proceedingsand deadlines in this matter shall be stayed until the Commission regains a complement of at least four FEC Commissioners. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/23/2020. (jds)
March 20, 2020 Filing 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50)(Siler, Jacob)
March 19, 2020 Filing 160 Stipulated MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Siler, Jacob)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #158 Motion Removal from electronic mailing certificate. Ronald J. Yengich and the law firm of YENGICH & XAIZ are allowed to be removed from the Electronic Mailing Certificate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/17/2019. (jds)
September 16, 2019 Filing 158 MOTION Removal from Electronic Mailing Certificate filed by Respondent Ronald J. Yengich. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Remove From Mailing Certificate) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Yengich, Ronald)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Motion to Take Deposition from Jeremy Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/11/2019. (jwt)
September 11, 2019 Filing 156 Consent MOTION to Take Deposition from Jeremy Johnson and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Kilfoyle, Tara)
August 26, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Jean Kilfoyle on behalf of Federal Election Commission (Kilfoyle, Tara)
August 22, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Kevin P. Hancock filed by Kevin Paul Hancock on behalf of Federal Election Commission (Hancock, Kevin)
April 22, 2019 Filing 153 STATUS REPORT by Jeremy David Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jeremy Johnson)(Porter, Karra)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDERdenying #130 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/19/2019. (mas)
April 11, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Compliance by Ronald J. Yengich (Yengich, Ronald)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER denying #142 Plaintiff Federal Election Commission's request for default judgment. In compliance with Judge Benson's September 20, 2017 Order, Mr. Yengich is ORDERED to produce the August 15, 2013, interview recording no later than Friday, April 12, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/8/2019. (mas)
April 5, 2019 Filing 149 RESPONSE to Motion re #142 MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Subpoena Responses MOTION to Expedite filed by Defendant Jeremy David Johnson. (Porter, Karra)
April 5, 2019 Filing 148 RESPONSE to Motion re #142 MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Subpoena Responses MOTION to Expedite filed by Respondent Ronald J. Yengich. (Yengich, Ronald)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/21/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. 5 Day Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/29/19. (jlw)
March 29, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE of Filing Stipulated Proposed Scheduling Order by Federal Election Commission (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Proposed Scheduling Order) (Hancock, Kevin)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. On March 20, 2019, Plaintiff Federal Election Commission (FEC) filed a short form discovery motion seeking sanctions against Defendant Jeremy Johnson (Mr. Johnson) and third-party witness Ronald Yengich (Mr. Yengich), based on a failure to comply with prior discovery orders #142 .Under the local rule, an opposing party must file its response to a short form discovery motion within five business days after filing. See, DUCivR 37-1(a)(6). Here, neither Mr. Johnson nor Mr. Yengich has filed a response, and the time within which to do so has expired. Upon review, the court GRANTS Mr. Johnson and Mr. Yengich an additional five (5) days within which to respond to the FEC's pending motion. Opposition memoranda, if any, should address both the merits of the pending motion and the failure to file a timely response. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Yengich at the address identified in the certificate of service [142 at 5]. Additionally, the court will email a courtesy copy to Mr. Yengich's designated email address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 03/29/2019. (amn) (docket text order, no document attached)
March 25, 2019 Filing 144 REPLY to Response to Motion re #130 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Dickerson, Allen)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 SHORT FORM DISCOVERY RULING AND ORDER: Defendant shall have thirty (30) days, from the date of this ruling, to: (1) provide corroborating support for his claim that he previously mailed discovery responses to the Commission; AND (2) re-send his discovery responses to the Commission. In addition, the parties shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this ruling to meet and confer and file a stipulated scheduling Order. See June 19, 2018 Docket Entry, ("Parties shall submit a new stipulated scheduling order when the stay is lifted."). Defendant's #139 Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/21/2019. (mas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 142 MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Subpoena Responses filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Siler, Jacob). Added MOTION to Expedite on 3/20/2019 (mas).
March 19, 2019 Filing 141 RESPONSE to Motion re #139 MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production MOTION to Expedite filed by Defendant Jeremy David Johnson. (Porter, Karra)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/12/2019. (reb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 139 MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Harry). Added MOTION to Expedite on 3/13/2019 (mas).
March 11, 2019 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #130 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Fee Reduction, #2 Exhibit B - Table of Clerical Time, #3 Exhibit C - Table of Time for Motion for Judgment, #4 Exhibit D - Table of Time for Reply in Support of Motion for Judgment, #5 Exhibit E - Table of Time for Motion for Clarification, #6 Exhibit F - General Counsel's Brief in MUR 6850, #7 Exhibit G - Notice to the Commission in MUR 6850)(Siler, Jacob)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #136 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #130 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 3/11/2019. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/30/2019. (mas)
January 30, 2019 Filing 136 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Harry)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #130 Motion for Attorney Fees until after resolution of gvmt shutdown; granting #133 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 12/27/18 (alt)
December 27, 2018 Modification of Docket re #133 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION for Attorney Fees, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Error: Motion requesting 2 possible reliefs was filed with only one incorrect relief selected. Correction: Second relief, "File Excess Pages", was added to the entry and first relief corrected to "Extension of Time to File Response/Reply". (alt)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #132 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #130 MOTION for Attorney Fees: Response due by 1/7/2019; granting #132 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 12/22/18 (alt)
December 26, 2018 Filing 133 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siler, Jacob). Added MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and corrected existing motion relief/entry text on 12/27/2018 (alt)
December 20, 2018 Filing 132 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support , MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siler, Jacob)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #129 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant John Swallow's Application for Attorneys' Fees may exceed, by five pages, the ten page limit applicable under DUCivR 7-1(a)(3)(C). Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 12/19/2018. (mas)
December 18, 2018 Filing 130 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Matter Under Review Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit B Matter Under Review Request to Respond to General Counsel's Notice, #3 Exhibit C Sworn Declaration of John Swallow, #4 Exhibit D Declaration of Allen Dickerson, #5 Exhibit E Declaration of Scott E. Thomas, #6 Exhibit F Declaration of Scott C. Williams, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(Dickerson, Allen)
December 18, 2018 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Dickerson, Allen)
November 29, 2018 Filing 128 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Sana Chaudhry filed by Sana Chaudhry on behalf of Federal Election Commission (Chaudhry, Sana)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #124 Defendant John Swallow's Motion for Partial Final Judgment Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 9/20/2018. (mas)
August 23, 2018 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #124 MOTION for Entry of Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: FEC Notice of Supplemental Authority in FEC v Rivera, #2 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Dickerson, Allen)
August 9, 2018 Filing 125 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #124 MOTION for Entry of Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Order))(Chaudhry, Sana)
July 26, 2018 Filing 124 MOTION for Partial Final Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Dickerson, Allen) Modified by correcting title on 7/26/2018 (mas).
June 19, 2018 Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Final Pretrial Conference on 7/2/2018 at 2:30 p.m. and the Jury Trial scheduled for 7/16/2018 is CANCELLED. Parties shall submit a new stipulated scheduling order when the stay is lifted. (reb)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Extending Stay. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/11/2018. (blh)
June 4, 2018 Filing 122 Stipulated MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Chaudhry, Sana)
June 4, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob S. Siler on behalf of Federal Election Commission (Siler, Jacob)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting #98 Defendant Swallow's Motion to Dismiss; denying #102 FEC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. 11 C.F.R. 110.4(b)(1)(iii) is ordered stricken from the Code of Federal Regulations and the FEC is forthwith ENJOINED from enforcing regulation 11 C.F.R. 110.4(b)(1)(iii). Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/5/2018. (blh)
March 27, 2018 Filing 119 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Cnsl present. After arguments were heard and discussion held on #98 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Dismiss, #102 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings :Court ruled: Taking the matter under advisement. Attorney for Plaintiff: Sana Chaudry and Harry J. Summers, Attorney for Defendant Allen Dickerson, Tyler Martinez and Scott C. Williams. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb)
February 21, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #98 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Dismiss, #102 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2018 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb)
January 29, 2018 Filing 117 REPLY to Response to Motion re #102 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Chaudhry, Sana)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #115 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #102 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/22/2018. (blh)
January 22, 2018 Filing 115 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Filing Deadline filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Chaudhry, Sana) Modified by changing event to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on 1/22/2018 (blh).
January 12, 2018 Filing 114 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #102 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Dickerson, Allen)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER re #98 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Swallow, #102 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Federal Election Commission. Defendant Swallow is allowed to file a memorandum in opposition to the FEC's Cross-Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. That brief shall be due on January 12, 2018. The FEC shall then have until January 26, 2018 to file its reply brief to its Cross-Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Should either party need additional time or pages, it may petition the Court. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 12/27/2017. (jwt)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #109 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #102 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Replies due by 1/12/2018. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 12/19/2017. (blh)
December 19, 2017 Filing 111 ERRATA to #110 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Defendant John Swallow . (Attachments: #1 Corrected Defendant John Swallows Reply in Support of Motion for Clarification, #2 Certificate of Service)(Dickerson, Allen)
December 19, 2017 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion re #105 MOTION Clarification re #91 Order on Motion to Stay, and Memorandum in Support , #109 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Dickerson, Allen)
December 18, 2017 Filing 109 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaudhry, Sana)
December 18, 2017 Filing 108 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Motion re #105 MOTION Clarification re #91 Order on Motion to Stay, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Chaudhry, Sana)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott E. Thomas for John Swallow. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 12/7/2017. (blh)
December 5, 2017 Filing 106 Defendant's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott E. Thomas on behalf of John Swallow, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2894966, filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B--ECF Registration Form, #3 Exhibit C--Proposed Order)(Yeates, Owen)
December 4, 2017 Filing 105 MOTION for Clarification re #91 Order on Motion to Stay, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Dickerson, Allen)
December 4, 2017 Filing 104 REPLY to Response to Motion re #98 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Dismiss, #102 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Dickerson, Allen)
November 20, 2017 Filing 103 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #98 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, MOTION to Dismiss and in Support re #102 Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Exhibit A), #2 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Order)) (Chaudhry, Sana)
November 20, 2017 Filing 102 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaudhry, Sana)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #95 Defendant Swallow's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's brief in response may exceed by five pages the 25-page limit. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/6/2017. (blh)
November 2, 2017 Filing 100 RESPONSE to Motion re #95 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Memorandum in Support of Defendant John Swallow's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaudhry, Sana)
October 25, 2017 Filing 99 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by John Swallow (Martinez, Tyler)
October 23, 2017 Filing 98 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support and Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Dickerson, Allen). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 10/24/2017 (blh).
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tyler Leandro Martinez for John Swallow. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/23/2017. (blh)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allen Dickerson for John Swallow. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/23/2017. (blh)
October 20, 2017 Filing 95 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Memorandum in Support of Defendant John Swallow's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Yeates, Owen)
October 20, 2017 Filing 94 Defendant's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tyler Leandro Martinez on behalf of John Swallow, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2866851, filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B--ECF Registration Form, #3 Exhibit C--Proposed Order)(Yeates, Owen)
October 20, 2017 Filing 93 Defendant's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allen Dickerson on behalf of John Swallow, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2866834, filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B--ECF Registration Form, #3 Exhibit C--Proposed Order)(Yeates, Owen)
October 20, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Owen D. Yeates on behalf of John Swallow (Yeates, Owen)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #87 Motion to Stay until the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit enters judgment in defendant Johnson's criminal appeal in United States v. Jeremy Johnson, No. 16-4146, with the exception that defendant Swallow may file a motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 9/20/2017. (blh)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying #75 Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena to Ron Yengich; granting #79 FEC's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 9/20/2017. (blh)
September 18, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on September 6, 2017 before Judge Dee Benson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number (801)328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2017. (blh) Modified by removing restricted text on 12/18/2017 (rks).
September 14, 2017 Filing 87 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Hancock, Kevin)
September 6, 2017 Filing 86 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Cnsl present. After arguments were heard and discussion held on #79 MOTION to Compel Defendant Jeremy Johnson to Respond to Discovery Requests and Memorandum in Support, #75 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Ron Yengich, Court ruled: Taking under advisement. Attorney for Plaintiff: Kevin Paul Hancock, Attorney for Defendant Scott C. Williams and Karra J. Porter. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb)
September 5, 2017 Filing 85 MOTION for Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support of Modifying the Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Scheduling Order))(Hancock, Kevin)
August 14, 2017 Filing 84 ***AMENDED***NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #79 MOTION to Compel Defendant Jeremy Johnson to Respond to Discovery Requests and Memorandum in Support , #75 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Ron Yengich : (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Motion Hearing RESET FOR WEDNESDAY 9/6/2017 at 03:00 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb)
August 3, 2017 Filing 83 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #79 MOTION to Compel Defendant Jeremy Johnson to Respond to Discovery Requests and Memorandum in Support , #75 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Ron Yengich : (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2017 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb)
July 26, 2017 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 MOTION to Compel Defendant Jeremy Johnson to Respond to Discovery Requests and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hancock, Kevin)
July 13, 2017 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Compel Defendant Jeremy Johnson to Respond to Discovery Requests and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Jeremy David Johnson. (Porter, Karra)
June 20, 2017 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Ron Yengich filed by Defendant Jeremy David Johnson. (Porter, Karra)
June 14, 2017 Filing 79 MOTION to Compel Defendant Jeremy Johnson to Respond to Discovery Requests and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Interview transcript), #2 Exhibit B (Johnson affidavit), #3 Exhibit C (Transcript of Apr. 25, 2017 status conf.), #4 Exhibit D (Johnson response), #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Kevin)
June 6, 2017 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #75 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Ron Yengich filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Mr. Johnson's 10th Cir. brief in US v. Johnson), #2 Exhibit B (Mr. Johnson's Affidavit in Utah v. Swallow), #3 Exhibit C (interview transcript excerpt 1), #4 Exhibit D (interview transcript excerpt 2))(Hancock, Kevin)
May 31, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Lauritzen on behalf of Jeremy David Johnson (Lauritzen, John)
May 31, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Karra J. Porter on behalf of Jeremy David Johnson (Porter, Karra)
May 30, 2017 Filing 75 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Ron Yengich filed by Defendant Jeremy David Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FEC Subpoena to Ron Yengich)(Porter, Karra)
April 27, 2017 Filing 74 Defendant Jeremy Johnson's ANSWER to #36 Amended Complaint filed by Jeremy David Johnson.(Porter, Karra)
April 25, 2017 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Cnsl present. Status of the case reviewed with the Court. Court will have Ms. Porter respond to Plas #71 Motion to Compel and answer the amended complaint within the next 10 days. The Jury Trial is currently set for July 16th, 2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for July 2nd, 2018. Status Conference held on 4/25/2017. Attorney for Plaintiff: Kevin Hancock, Attorney for Defendant: Karra Porter and Scott C. Williams. Court Reporter: Ed Young.(reb)
April 12, 2017 Filing 72 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #71 MOTION to Compel Defendant Jeremy Johnson to Respond to Discovery Requests and the Amended Complaint MOTION to Expedite filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Hancock, Kevin)
March 24, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION to Compel Defendant Jeremy Johnson to Respond to Discovery Requests and the Amended Complaint , MOTION to Expedite filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (FEC's First Set of Discovery Requests to Defendant Johnson), #2 Exhibit (e-mails between FEC and defendant Johnson's counsel (1)), #3 Exhibit (Transcript of July 1, 2016 Hearing), #4 Exhibit (e-mails between FEC and defendant Johnson's counsel (2)), #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaudhry, Sana)
March 21, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE OF FILING of Defendant John Swallow's Initial Disclosures filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Williams, Scott)
March 21, 2017 Filing 69 ***AMENDED***NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Status Conference RESET FOR TUESDAY APRIL 4/25/2017 at 01:00 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb)
March 16, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE of Filing of Amended Certificate of Service by Federal Election Commission re #67 Notice of Appearance (Chaudhry, Sana)
March 14, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Sana Chaudhry on behalf of Federal Election Commission (Chaudhry, Sana)
March 6, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Status Conference set for 3/29/2017 at 02:00 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:Expert Discovery due by 12/22/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2018 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. Five Day Jury Trial set for 7/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/1/17. (jmr)
February 28, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE of Proposed Scheduling Order by Federal Election Commission (Hancock, Kevin)
February 28, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiff FEC's Proposed Third Amended Scheduling Order by Federal Election Commission (Hancock, Kevin)
November 29, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Report and Scheduling Conference held on November 2, 2016 before Judge Dee Benson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number (801)328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/30/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2017. (blh) Modified by removing restricted text on 2/27/2017 (blh).
November 22, 2016 Filing 59 Remark - Jeremy Johnson is duplicated several times in the court's database and therefore they are being consolidated into one entity with the full name of "Jeremy David Johnson". (rks)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER STAYING CASE until March 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/21/2016. (blh)
November 16, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Order by Federal Election Commission (Hancock, Kevin)
November 2, 2016 Filing 60 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Cnsl present. After discussion held with the Court. Cnsl for Mr. Swallow moved to have the case stayed until March 1, 2017. Court granted the motion and made findings on the record. The Parties shall work on a joint scheduling order. Cnsl to prepare the order. Scheduling Conference held on 11/2/2016. Attorney for Plaintiff: Kevin Hancock, Attorney for Defendant Karra Porter and Scott C. Williams. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb)
August 30, 2016 Filing 56 ***AMENDED***NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for WEDNESDAY 11/2/2016 at ***NEW TIME*** 03:00 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb)
August 9, 2016 Filing 55 Mail #53 sent to Jeremy Johnson - Returned as undeliverable as addressed. Unable to forward. No new address available. (kpf)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #44 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 7/27/2016. (blh)
July 21, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE OF FILING of Order filed by Defendant John Swallow. (Williams, Scott)
July 1, 2016 Filing 54 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Cnsl present. After arguments were heard and discussion held, Court ruled staying the case until November 1, 2016. SEE ORDER IN FILE FOR SPECIFICS. Court sets a scheduling conference for 11/2/2016 at 2:00 p.m. Mr. Williams to prepare the order. Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2016 re #44 MOTION to Alter Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Federal Election Commission. Written Order to follow oral order: Y. Attorney for Plaintiff: Kevin Hancock, Attorney for Defendant Karra Porter and Scott C. Williams. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb)
June 27, 2016 Filing 51 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Unable to forward. Mail sent to Jeremy Johnson (kpf)
June 23, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #44 MOTION to Alter Judgment and Memorandum in Support : (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2016 at 02:00 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - granting #47 Motion for Scheduling Order. Expert Discovery due by 4/17/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2017 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. Five Day Jury Trial set for 10/16/2017 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/13/16. (jmr)
June 13, 2016 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Alter Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Hancock, Kevin)
June 7, 2016 Filing 47 Consent MOTION for Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support of Amending First Amended Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Scheduling Order)(Hancock, Kevin)
May 26, 2016 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 MOTION to Alter Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Jeremy Johnson. (Porter, Karra)
May 16, 2016 Filing 45 Defendant John Swallow's ANSWER to #36 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by John Swallow. Attorney Scott C. Williams added to party John Swallow(pty:dft)(Williams, Scott)
May 9, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION to Alter Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Kevin)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #40 Temporary Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/28/16. (jlw)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott T. Evans and Karra J. Porter withdrawn from case for Jeremy Johnson. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/27/16. (jlw)
April 28, 2016 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Federal Election Commission as to John Swallow Waiver sent on 3/18/2016, answer due 5/17/2016. (Hancock, Kevin)
April 20, 2016 Filing 40 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support re Discovery filed by Defendant Jeremy Johnson. (Porter, Karra)
April 20, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Jeremy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jeremy Johnson Consent, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Karra)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order: Discovery due by 10/17/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2017 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. 5 Day Jury Trial set for 4/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/28/16. (jlw)
March 24, 2016 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support of Amending Current Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed First Amended Scheduling Order))(Hancock, Kevin)
February 24, 2016 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. New Defendants: John Swallow., filed by Federal Election Commission. (Hancock, Kevin)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Joinder; denying #29 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 2/23/16. (jlw)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 2/23/16. (jlw)
January 14, 2016 Filing 33 Third Party MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 Third Party MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Supplement Complaint and for Permissive Joinder; or in the alternative, to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Regards to the Same filed by Defendant Jeremy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Scott)
January 11, 2016 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #29 Third Party MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Supplement Complaint and for Permissive Joinder; or in the alternative, to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Regards to the Same filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Hancock, Kevin)
January 11, 2016 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support or in the Alternative to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Hancock, Kevin)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support or in the Alternative to Strike Affirmative Defenses. Responses due by 1/11/2016. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 12/29/15. (jlw)
December 24, 2015 Filing 29 Third Party MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Supplement Complaint and for Permissive Joinder; or in the alternative, to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Regards to the Same filed by Defendant Jeremy Johnson. (Williams, Scott)
December 24, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE of Special Appearance of Counsel for John Swallow by Jeremy Johnson re #25 MOTION for Joinder and Memorandum in Support and Motion to Amend and Supplement the Complaint (Williams, Scott)
December 23, 2015 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Kevin)
December 21, 2015 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support or in the Alternative to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Jeremy Johnson. (Porter, Karra)
December 10, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION for Joinder and Memorandum in Support and Motion to Amend and Supplement the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Redline of Proposed Amended Complaint), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Kevin)
December 10, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudio J. Pavia on behalf of Federal Election Commission (Pavia, Claudio)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 1/29/2016. Discovery due by 6/27/2016. Motion Deadlines - see schedule. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2017 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. 5 Day Jury Trial set for 4/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/7/15. (jlw)
November 12, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support or in the Alternative to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Defendant's Initial Disclosures), #2 Affidavit Declaration of Counsel, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Kevin)
November 10, 2015 Filing 21 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Hancock, Kevin)
November 3, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial SchedulingThe court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference (jlw)
November 3, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Federal Election Commission, Defendant Jeremy Johnson. (jlw)
October 27, 2015 Filing 18 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Jeremy Johnson. (Porter, Karra)
October 19, 2015 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jeremy Johnson.(Porter, Karra)
October 9, 2015 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A (Certificates of Admission), #3 Exhibit B (e-mails between FEC and clerk's office (1)), #4 Exhibit C (e-mails between FEC and clerk's office (2)), #5 Exhibit D (e-mail from FEC to defendant), #6 Exhibit E (UPS receipt), #7 Exhibit F (e-mails between FEC and defendant's counsel (1)), #8 Exhibit G (e-mails between FEC and defendant's counsel (2)), #9 Exhibit H (e-mails between FEC and defendant's counsel (3)))(Hancock, Kevin)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Waiver of Local Counsel Rules; denying #13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/7/15. (jlw)
September 8, 2015 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Waiver of Local Counsel Rules and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Certificates of Admission of FEC counsel), #2 Exhibit C (e-mails between FEC and clerk's office), #3 Exhibit Declaration of Counsel)(Hancock, Kevin)
September 8, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Jeremy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DE10 Memo in Opposition to Motion for Waiver of Local Counsel Rules)(Porter, Karra)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION for Waiver of Local Counsel Rules and Memorandum in Support . Replies due by 9/8/2015. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/13/15. (jlw)
August 12, 2015 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Memorandum in Support of FEC's Motion for Waiver of Local Counsel Rules filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Kevin)
August 5, 2015 Filing 10 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Waiver of Local Counsel Rules and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Jeremy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Daien order, #2 Exhibit Keck order, #3 Exhibit Tribune article 06242015, #4 Exhibit Tribune article 06252015)(Porter, Karra)
July 22, 2015 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Federal Election Commission as to Jeremy Johnson Waiver sent on 6/19/2015, answer due 8/18/2015. (Hancock, Kevin)
July 14, 2015 Filing 8 Correspondence from LSY, Chief Deputy Clerk to Dft (alt)
July 9, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose by Jeremy Johnson re #4 MOTION for Waiver of Local Counsel Rules and Memorandum in Support (Porter, Karra)
June 25, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott T. Evans on behalf of Jeremy Johnson (Evans, Scott)
June 25, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Karra J. Porter on behalf of Jeremy Johnson (Porter, Karra)
June 19, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION for Waiver of Local Counsel Rules and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order from FEC v. Orton, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hancock, Kevin)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Tena Campbell recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dee Benson for all further proceedings. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 6/19/15 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
June 19, 2015 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jeremy Johnson No Filing Fee, filed by Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Hancock, Kevin)
June 19, 2015 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff Federal Election Commission is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (bdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Election Commission v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy David Johnson
Represented By: John D. Lauritzen
Represented By: Scott T. Evans
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Scott Todd Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Swallow
Represented By: Tyler Leandro Martinez
Represented By: Scott E. Thomas
Represented By: Owen D. Yeates
Represented By: Allen Dickerson
Represented By: Scott C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Election Commission
Represented By: Lisa Stevenson
Represented By: Harry J. Summers
Represented By: Sana Chaudhry
Represented By: Claudio J. Pavia
Represented By: Kevin Deeley
Represented By: Jacob S. Siler
Represented By: Kevin Paul Hancock
Represented By: Tara Jean Kilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald J. Yengich
Represented By: Ronald J. Yengich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?