Corel Software v. Microsoft

Plaintiff: Corel Software
Defendant: Microsoft
Case Number: 2:2015cv00528
Filed: July 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N. Parrish
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 230 Microsofts Motion to Stay. This action is STAYED pending resolution of the Reexamination with the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/14/2019. (jds)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 211 Corels motion to compel discovery from Mr. Gates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/13/2019. (jds)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 178 Microsofts short form discovery motion re: reexamination discovery; denying 193 Corels motion for reconsideration of the October 5 Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/18/2019. (jds)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 159 Corel Software, LLCs Motion to Amend Final Infringement Contentions. Corel shall have seven days from the date of this order to serve its amended Final Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/5/2018. (jds)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 171 Microsofts short form discovery motion for a protective order; granting in part and denying in part 173 Corels short form motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/5/2018. (jds)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERdenying 145 Motion for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/31/2018. (jds)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying without prejudice 120 Motion to Take Deposition from Bill Gates; granting 134 Motion for Clarification. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/22/2016. (srs)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 78 Motion to Compel; granting 80 Motion to Stay until such time as the PTO determines whether to institute IPR. Should the PTO reject Microsofts IPR petitions, the stay shall be lifted. Should the PT Oinstitute IPR proceedings on some or all of Microsofts IPR petitions, the stay shall remain inplace until resolution of IPR. The parties shall complete the fact discovery ordered above, butthis matter is STAYED until the court orders otherwise. Wit hin fourteen (14)days of the date of this order, Microsoft shall provide an unredacted copy of the Lucent Licenseand identify its rule 30(b)(6) deponent. The parties shall also meet and confer regarding amutually convenient time for that deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/23/16. (jlw)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 37 Motion to Change Venue; denying 54 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Facts. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/26/16 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corel Software v. Microsoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corel Software
Represented By: Aaron R. Fahrenkrog
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Represented By: John K. Harting
Represented By: Stephen J. Hill
Represented By: Benjamen C. Linden
Represented By: William H. Manning
Represented By: Chad S. Pehrson
Represented By: Terry E. Welch
Represented By: Christine S. Yun Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Represented By: Samuel C. Straight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?