Garth O. Green Enterprises et al v. Standard Plumbing Supply
Petitioner: Garth O. Green Enterprises, Garth O. Green, Michael Green, GW Green Family Limited Partnership and Wendy Green
Respondent: Standard Plumbing Supply
Case Number: 2:2015cv00556
Filed: August 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 461 Motion in Limine and for Discovery Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/29/2018. (jwt)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 250 Motion for Order to Show Cause: The new sanctions amount is $34,082.84 and Mr. Mumford is barred from further action or appearance in this case until further order. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/5/17 (alt)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion to Dismiss - the second, third, sixth, seventh, eighth, and ninth causes of action are dismissed with prejudice as to the Greens; finding as moot 66 Mo tion to Dismiss Party; granting in part and denying in part 187 Motion for Leave to File; granting 217 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Wendy Green; granting 225 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to GW Green. The Standard Parties are not granted leave to amend the Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/29/17 (alt)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 241 Motion to Stay Enforcement of Sanctions: Mr. Mumford must immediately pay $25,115.74 to Standard Plumbing. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/17/17 (alt)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 167 Motion to Reconsider; denying 195 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/7/17 (alt)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 163 Standard's MOTION for Determination of Sanctions Award Against Attorney Marcus R. Mumford. Mr. Mumford must pay $25,115.74 to Standard Plumbing within 28 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 2/13/2017. (jds)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 62 Motion for Joinder of GW Green Family Limited Partnership and Wendy Green as Third Party Defendants. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 1/25/17 (alt)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 57 Motion for Sanctions; denying 81 Motion for Sanctions. Counsel for the Greens, Marcus Mumford, must pay to Standard Plumbing the attorney fees and costs incurred in connection with preparing, serving, and filing the 57 Motion. A motion for determination of sanctions is due on or before 1/23/17. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 1/18/17 (alt)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 55 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - the motion is construed as a motion to dismiss Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth Causes of Action against Standard Plumbing with prejudice; finding as moot 58 Motion per Rule 56(f); finding as moot 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot 60 Motion to Reconsider; finding as moot 136 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 12/27/16 (alt)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying 68 Motion for Reconsideration; finding as moot 56 Motion for Release of Lis Pendens; finding as moot 56 Motion for Bond; finding as moot 108 Motion to Stay ; finding as moot 116 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on August 22 2016. (DN)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 6 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying 29 Motion for Extension of Time; ORDER REFERRING MOTION 23 MOTION for Estimation of Claims to Bankruptcy Judge R. Kimball Mosier. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 2/1/16 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garth O. Green Enterprises et al v. Standard Plumbing Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Garth O. Green Enterprises
Represented By: Adam C. Dunn
Represented By: Clifford V. Dunn
Represented By: Marcus R. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Garth O. Green
Represented By: Adam C. Dunn
Represented By: Clifford V. Dunn
Represented By: Marcus R. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Green
Represented By: Adam C. Dunn
Represented By: Clifford V. Dunn
Represented By: Marcus R. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GW Green Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Steven W. Call
Represented By: Elaine A. Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wendy Green
Represented By: Adam C. Dunn
Represented By: Clifford V. Dunn
Represented By: Marcus R. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Standard Plumbing Supply
Represented By: Ryan R. Beckstrom
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Adelaide Maudsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?