Bates v. Avalon of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Bates and Betsy Bates
Defendant: Avalon of Utah, Avalon Care Center-V.A. Ivins, Avalon Care Center-V.A. Ivins doing business as Southern Utah Veterans Home-Ivins and Avalon of Utah doing business as Avalon Healthcare Group
Case Number: 2:2016cv00062
Filed: January 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET TEXT ORDER - The court orders the parties to follow the Short Form Discovery Motion procedure as outlined in the attached document in this case for all discovery disputes arising after this date. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/23/2016. (jds)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2016 vacated. Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 7/5/2016. Discovery due by 4/10/2017. Motions due by 6/5/2017. If the parties do not intend to file dispositive or potentially dispositive motions, a scheduling conference will be held for purposes of setting a trial date. (Scheduling Conference set for 6/14/2017 at 02:45 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups) Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/10/2016. (blh)
May 10, 2016 Filing 15 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Haymore, Jason)
April 4, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by IPT Clerk)The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at # http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/formpage.html, should be prepared 21 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date.NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel(a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report; and(b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to #ipt@utd.uscourts.gov21 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at # http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/ipt.htmlIf counsel or the parties would like to participate by phone they must email the IPT Clerk at least two days in advance at #ipt@utd.uscourts.gov to make arrangements. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2016 at 11:00 AM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (jds)
March 24, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Avalon Care Center-V.A. Ivins, Avalon of Utah, Plaintiff Betsy Bates. (jmr)
March 24, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial SchedulingThe court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference. (jmr)
March 23, 2016 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by Avalon Care Center-V.A. Ivins, Avalon of Utah.(Castleberry, David)
February 29, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Bednar on behalf of Avalon Care Center-V.A. Ivins, Avalon of Utah (Bednar, Steven)
February 24, 2016 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint signed by Deputy Clerk. Answer deadline updated to 3/23/2016 for all Defendants. (lnp)
February 24, 2016 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED to 3/23/2016 for All Defendants. (lnp)
February 23, 2016 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Defendants Avalon Care Center-V.A. Ivins, Avalon of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Attorney David C. Castleberry added to party Avalon Care Center-V.A. Ivins(pty:dft), Attorney David C. Castleberry added to party Avalon of Utah(pty:dft)(Castleberry, David)
February 10, 2016 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Betsy Bates as to Avalon Care Center-V.A. Ivins served on 2/8/2016, answer due 2/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Returned Summons)(Haymore, Jason)
February 10, 2016 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Betsy Bates as to Avalon of Utah served on 2/8/2016, answer due 2/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Returned Summons)(Haymore, Jason)
February 4, 2016 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Avalon of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mms)
February 4, 2016 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Avalon Care Center-V.A. Ivins. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mms)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/27/2016. (aw)
January 26, 2016 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2424461), filed by Betsy Bates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Haymore, Jason)
January 26, 2016 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff Betsy Bates is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Avalon of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon of Utah
Represented By: David C. Castleberry
Represented By: Steven C. Bednar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon Care Center-V.A. Ivins
Represented By: David C. Castleberry
Represented By: Steven C. Bednar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon Care Center-V.A. Ivins doing business as Southern Utah Veterans Home-Ivins
Represented By: David C. Castleberry
Represented By: Steven C. Bednar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon of Utah doing business as Avalon Healthcare Group
Represented By: David C. Castleberry
Represented By: Steven C. Bednar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy Bates
Represented By: Jason D. Haymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?