Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission et al v. San Juan County et al
Plaintiff: Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Peggy Phillips, Mark Maryboy, Wilfred Jones, Terry Whitehat, Betty Billie Farley, Willie Skow and Mabel Skow
Defendant: San Juan County, John David Nielson, Phil Lyman, Bruce Adams and Rebecca Benally
Case Number: 2:2016cv00154
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Jill N. Parrish
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 188 Motion to Quash; granting 192 Motion to Extend Fact Discovery. The new fact discovery deadline is February 12, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the current deposition date for January 12, 2018 is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 1/11/2018. (jds)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Granting Plaintiffs' 93 Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims. County Defendants' First Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. County Defen dants' Second Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. County Defendants' Third Counterclaim for Civil Conspiracy under Utah law is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. County Defendants&# 039; Fourth Counterclaim for federal civil rights violations is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. County Defendants' Fifth Counterclaim for abuse of process under Utah law is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/7/17. (dla)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 116 Motion to Compel and Request for Extension of Fact Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 3/29/2017. (eat)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING 94 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/14/16. (ss)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 54 Motion to Expedite Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/31/16. (jlw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission et al v. San Juan County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission
Represented By: Leah M. Farrell
Represented By: Arusha Gordon
Represented By: Maya L. Kane
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: John M. Mejia
Represented By: M. Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: William A. Rudnick
Represented By: Raymond M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Phillips
Represented By: Leah M. Farrell
Represented By: Arusha Gordon
Represented By: Maya L. Kane
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: John M. Mejia
Represented By: M. Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: William A. Rudnick
Represented By: Raymond M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Maryboy
Represented By: Leah M. Farrell
Represented By: Arusha Gordon
Represented By: Maya L. Kane
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: John M. Mejia
Represented By: M. Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: William A. Rudnick
Represented By: Raymond M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfred Jones
Represented By: Leah M. Farrell
Represented By: Arusha Gordon
Represented By: Maya L. Kane
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: John M. Mejia
Represented By: M. Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: William A. Rudnick
Represented By: Raymond M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Whitehat
Represented By: Leah M. Farrell
Represented By: Arusha Gordon
Represented By: Maya L. Kane
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: John M. Mejia
Represented By: M. Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: William A. Rudnick
Represented By: Raymond M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Billie Farley
Represented By: Leah M. Farrell
Represented By: Arusha Gordon
Represented By: Maya L. Kane
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: John M. Mejia
Represented By: M. Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: William A. Rudnick
Represented By: Raymond M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Skow
Represented By: Leah M. Farrell
Represented By: Arusha Gordon
Represented By: Maya L. Kane
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: John M. Mejia
Represented By: M. Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: William A. Rudnick
Represented By: Raymond M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mabel Skow
Represented By: Leah M. Farrell
Represented By: Arusha Gordon
Represented By: Maya L. Kane
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: John M. Mejia
Represented By: M. Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: William A. Rudnick
Represented By: Raymond M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan County
Represented By: Britton R. Butterfield
Represented By: Carl F. Huefner
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David Nielson
Represented By: Britton R. Butterfield
Represented By: Carl F. Huefner
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Lyman
Represented By: Britton R. Butterfield
Represented By: Carl F. Huefner
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Adams
Represented By: Britton R. Butterfield
Represented By: Carl F. Huefner
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Benally
Represented By: Britton R. Butterfield
Represented By: Carl F. Huefner
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?