Eagle Air Med et al v. Sentinel Air Medical Alliance et al
Plaintiff: Eagle Air Med and Valley Med Flight
Defendant: Sentinel Air Medical Alliance and Jeffrey Frazier
Case Number: 2:2016cv00176
Filed: March 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION re 422 Memorandum Decision/Order denying 438 Motion for Clarification; granting 441 Motion for Reconsideration: upon reconsideration, 206 motion for summary judgment is granted in its entirety. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/17/19 (alt)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 206 Sentinels Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 8/30/20019. (jds)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 357 Motion to Stay Effects of Orders Pending Writ of Mandamus ; denying 360 Motion for Extension of Time To Comply with Computer Turnover Order. See Order for details re: further communications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/29/19. (jmr)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 287 Motion for Reconsideration re 247 Memorandum Decision on Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/23/19 (alt)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 178 Defendants' Cross-Motions for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/3/18. (dla)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying coverted 127 Motion to Quash (Protective Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/1/18 (alt)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 105 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 1/25/18 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle Air Med et al v. Sentinel Air Medical Alliance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Air Med
Represented By: Royce B. Covington
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: Rachel L. Wertheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Med Flight
Represented By: Royce B. Covington
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: Rachel L. Wertheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Air Medical Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?