Aus et al v. Salt Lake County et al
Plaintiff: Jason Aus, Janis Aus and Aus, Jeremy the Estate of
Defendant: Salt Lake County and James Winder
Case Number: 2:2016cv00266
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J. Furse
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 82 The § 1983 Defendants motion for summary judgment; granting in part and denying in part 88 Wellcons motion in limine; denying 88 Wellcons motion for summary judgment ; denying [9 7] The § 1983 Defendants motion to strike ; denying as moot 104 Wellcons motion to strike; granting in part and denying in part 85 The § 1983 Defendants motion in limine. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and, within 28 days of the date of this order, propose an amended scheduling order containing new deadlines for expert designation, expert discovery, and any motions seeking to exclude expert testimony. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/10/2019. (jds)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Overruling 66 Plaintiffs' Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/6/2018. (jds)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 59 Motion to Compel Discovery. The Court FURTHER ORDERS the production of the pharmacy records within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 4/11/2018. (jds)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 45 Second Motion to Amend/Correct 31 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/17/17. (jlw)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Overruling Plaintiffs' 30 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Decision and Affirming the 27 Order of the Magistrate in this Case. The Court further orders that the 29 Scheduling Order is hereby amended to allow Plaintiffs to file a motion to add a medical malpractice claim against Defendant Wellcon, Inc. on or before 6/2/2017. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/17/2017. (eat)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM DECISION and denying 21 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 2/1/17. (jlw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aus et al v. Salt Lake County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Aus
Represented By: Tyler B. Ayres
Represented By: Daniel M. Baczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis Aus
Represented By: Tyler B. Ayres
Represented By: Daniel M. Baczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aus, Jeremy the Estate of
Represented By: Tyler B. Ayres
Represented By: Daniel M. Baczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County
Represented By: Richard D. Bissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Winder
Represented By: Richard D. Bissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?