United States of America et al v. St. Mark's Hospital et al
Plaintiff: |
United States of America and Gerald Polukoff |
Defendant: |
St Mark's Hospital, Intermountain Healthcare, Inc, Sherman Sorensen, Sorensen Cardiovascular Group, HCA, Inc. and Intermountain Medical Center |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00304 |
Filed: |
April 14, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Central Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Brooke C. Wells |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
31 U.S.C. § 3729 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 21, 2020 |
Filing
537
MEMORANDUM DECISION -Granting 520 Expedited Motion to Compel Non-Party The University of Utah to Produce Documents Withheld Based On Asserted Privilege. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/21/20. (alf)
|
August 20, 2020 |
Filing
526
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: granting 460 Relator's Motion for Leave to Amend Relator's Third Amended Complaint for Damages and Other Relief Under the False Claims Act; denying 458 Expedited Motion to Quash or Limit R elator's FRCP 45 Subpoena to St. Mark's Hospital; granting 459 Relator's Amended Expedited Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Responsive Medical Records; denying 474 Relator's Expedited Motion to Compel Defendant Sherman S orensen, M.D. to Provide Complete and Responsive Interrogatory Answers; denying 476 Relator's Expedited Motion to Compel Defendant Sorensen Cardiovascular Group to Provide Complete and Responsive Interrogatory Answers; denying 477 Sorensen D efendants' Expedited Motion to Compel Compliance with the Court's Order and Request for Sanctions and Fees; denying 505 Relator's Emergency Motion Filed Under Seal for Leave to Supplement; granting 519 Relator's Motion to Modify the Court's Prior Order Granting an Extension of Expert Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/20/2020. (jds)
|
August 19, 2020 |
Filing
524
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 384 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 381 Motion to Take Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 8/19/20 (alt) Modified on 8/19/2020: corrected name of judge (alt)
|
June 17, 2020 |
Filing
503
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 380 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dfts' Expert Dr. John Lassetter; denying 383 Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dfts' Expert Jonathan M. Tobis, M.D. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/17/20 (alt)
|
June 3, 2020 |
Filing
491
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 296 Motion to Exclude Experts; denying 297 Motion to Strike Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/3/20 (alt)
|
March 20, 2020 |
Filing
439
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER overruling Objection of Magistrate Judge Decision. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/20/2020. (las)
|
March 9, 2020 |
Filing
430
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 332 Motion to Deny or Defer Consideration of Sorensen Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 300 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/9/2020. (las)
|
February 25, 2020 |
Filing
425
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - It is ORDERED that Defendants objection (Docket No. 385 ) is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/25/2020. (las)
|
January 21, 2020 |
Filing
404
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 354 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/17/2020. (las)
|
September 25, 2019 |
Filing
293
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 254 Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/25/2019. (las)
|
September 16, 2019 |
Filing
292
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER withdrawing 267 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 267 Motion for Leave to take Additional Discovery. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/16/2019. (las)
|
January 19, 2017 |
Filing
205
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 168 IHC Motion to Dismiss ; finding as moot 170 Motion to Stay ; granting 172 Dr. Sorensen's Motion to Dismiss ; finding as moot 173 Motion to Stay ; finding as moot 175 Motion to Stay ; granting 190 St. Mark's Motion to Dismiss ; denying 204 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/19/17. (jlw)
|
April 13, 2016 |
Filing
125
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 4/13/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/14/2016.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?