Spencer v. Harley Davidson Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Spencer
Defendant: Harley Davidson Inc and Harley Davidson Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00427
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-granting 140 Motion to Expedite; granting 140 Motion for Short Term Discovery; Motions terminated: 140 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Leave to Reopen Plaintiff's Deposition filed by BWI North American. The court authorizes BWI to take Plaintiff's deposition on a date that is mutually convenient for the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/4/20. (jrj)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 135 Motion for Short Term Discovery to Compel Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/26/19 (alt)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 79 Motion for Summary Judgment in favor of Delphi Automotive Systems: Plaintiff's claims for relief are dismissed without prejudice as against Delphi Automotive Systems due to the lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/27/19 (alt)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 54 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/18/18 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Harley Davidson Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Spencer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Eisenberg
Represented By: Christopher P. Higley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley Davidson Inc
Represented By: Katherine E. Venti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley Davidson Motor Company
Represented By: Katherine E. Venti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?