Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation et al v. Lawrence et al
Plaintiff: Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation, Uintah and Ouray Tribal Business Committee and Ute Energy Holdings
Defendant: Barry G. Lawrence and Lynn D. Becker
Case Number: 2:2016cv00579
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Uintah
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Shelby
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-As such, the Tribe's Motion to Quash that Subpoena (ECF No. 206) and Jurriuss Motion for Protective Order from the same (ECF No. 214) are HEREBY DENIED AS MOOT. Becker and Jurrius are ORDERED to, wit hin ten (10) days of the date of this order, to submit to the court a sworn and itemized statement showing the actual time expended insuch matters and the rate at which fees were computed. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/31/21. (jrj)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION-stayed 52 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 52 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 52 Motion for Permanent Injunction ; stayed 52 Motion for TRO; stay ed 53 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 53 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 53 Motion for Permanent Injunction ; stayed 53 Motion for TRO; stayed 54 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 54 Motion for Preliminary Injun ction; denying 54 Motion for Permanent Injunction ; stayed 54 Motion for TRO; denying as moot 88 Motion ; denying as moot 97 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 98 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 99 Motion in Limine; denying 110 Moti on to Consolidate Cases; stayed 114 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying as moot 124 Motion to Strike ; granting 133 Motion ; stayed 134 Motion for Sanctions; granting 135 Motion. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 4/30/18. (jmr)
February 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 82 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/17/2018. (tdp)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION-the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction under 1367 or address any of the Tribe's pending motions. Instead, the court stays this matter pending resolution of these issues in the state court, including any appellate proceedings. Case stayed.Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/31/18. (jmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation et al v. Lawrence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation
Represented By: Frances C. Bassett
Represented By: Thomasina Real Bird
Represented By: J. Preston Stieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uintah and Ouray Tribal Business Committee
Represented By: Frances C. Bassett
Represented By: Thomasina Real Bird
Represented By: J. Preston Stieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ute Energy Holdings
Represented By: Frances C. Bassett
Represented By: Thomasina Real Bird
Represented By: J. Preston Stieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry G. Lawrence
Represented By: Brent M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn D. Becker
Represented By: David K. Isom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?