Action Target Inc v. Challenge Targets et al
Plaintiff: Action Target Inc
Defendant: Challenge Targets, Wal-Mart Stores, Midway Arms a Missouri corporation doing business as MidwayUSA, Optics Planet and Brownells Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv01045
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2016 Filing 35 Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (las)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Dismiss. The case is dismissed with prejudice. Case Closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/13/2016. (las)
December 12, 2016 Filing 33 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Action Target Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bateman, Randall) Modified on 12/13/2016 changed from a Notice to a Motion (las).
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Wagner for Brownells Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/5/2016. (las)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Doowon R. Chung for Brownells Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/5/2016. (las)
December 2, 2016 Filing 30 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Brownells Inc (blh)
December 2, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Action Target Inc, Defendants Brownells Inc, Challenge Targets, Midway Arms, Optics Planet, Wal-Mart Stores. Form due by 12/19/2016. NOTE- Form sent out at the request of EJF Chambers. (las)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time for defendant Midway Arms, Inc. to answer. It is hereby ordered that: Midway Arms, Inc. shall have until and including December 15, 2016 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/01/2016. (kpf)
December 1, 2016 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for Midway Arms answer due 12/15/2016. (kpf)
November 30, 2016 Filing 27 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time Answer and Memorandum in Support for Midway Arms filed by Plaintiff Action Target Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bateman, Randall)
November 30, 2016 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Brownells Inc. (Orton, R.)
November 30, 2016 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Robert McAllister re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Brownells Inc. (Orton, R.)
November 30, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Brownells Inc. (Orton, R.)
November 17, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Doowon R. Chung , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2641022, filed by Defendant Brownells Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orton, R.)
November 17, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin P. Wagner , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2641003, filed by Defendant Brownells Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orton, R.)
November 17, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis S. Jones on behalf of Brownells Inc (Jones, Alexis)
November 16, 2016 Filing 20 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Action Target Inc. (Bateman, Randall)
November 15, 2016 Filing 19 CLERKS ORDER GRANTING re #18 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint signed by L. Pagel, Deputy Clerk. (lnp)
November 15, 2016 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for Brownells Inc answer due 11/30/2016. (lnp)
November 14, 2016 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Brownells Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orton, R.)
November 14, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Willis Orton on behalf of Brownells Inc (Orton, R.)
November 7, 2016 Filing 16 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Challenge Targets, Optics Planet, Wal-Mart Stores. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re Dismissing Complaint)(Clegg, Perry)
November 7, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry S. Clegg on behalf of Challenge Targets, Optics Planet, Wal-Mart Stores (Clegg, Perry)
November 4, 2016 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Action Target Inc as to Midway Arms served on 10/26/2016, answer due 11/16/2016. (Bateman, Randall)
November 4, 2016 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Action Target Inc as to Challenge Targets served on 10/29/2016, answer due 11/21/2016. (Bateman, Randall)
November 1, 2016 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Action Target Inc as to Wal-Mart Stores served on 10/17/2016, answer due 11/7/2016. (Bateman, Randall)
November 1, 2016 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Action Target Inc as to Optics Planet served on 10/24/2016, answer due 11/14/2016. (Bateman, Randall)
November 1, 2016 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Action Target Inc as to Brownells Inc served on 10/26/2016, answer due 11/16/2016. (Bateman, Randall)
October 12, 2016 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Wal-Mart Stores. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mms)
October 12, 2016 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Optics Planet. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mms)
October 12, 2016 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Midway Arms. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mms)
October 12, 2016 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Challenge Targets. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mms)
October 12, 2016 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brownells Inc. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mms)
October 12, 2016 Filing 4 Modification of Docket: Error: Counsel filed against plaintiff instead of defendants. Correction: Docket text has been modified to reflect complaint is filed against defendants rather than plaintiff; answer records corrected. re #2 Complaint. (mms)
October 11, 2016 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (dla)
October 7, 2016 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Challenge Targets, Wal-Mart Stores, Midway Arms, Optics Planet, Brownells Inc All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2612046) filed by Action Target Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A- U.S. Patent No. 6,994,348, #3 Exhibit B- U.S. Patent No. 6.994,349, #4 Exhibit C- Challenge Advertisement) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Bateman, Randall) Modified to reflect complaint is filed against defendants rather than plaintiff on 10/12/2016 (mms).
October 7, 2016 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Action Target Inc is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Action Target Inc v. Challenge Targets et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Challenge Targets
Represented By: Perry S. Clegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores
Represented By: Perry S. Clegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midway Arms a Missouri corporation doing business as MidwayUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optics Planet
Represented By: Perry S. Clegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownells Inc
Represented By: Doowon R. Chung
Represented By: Kevin Wagner
Represented By: R. Willis Orton
Represented By: Alexis S. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Action Target Inc
Represented By: Randall B. Bateman
Represented By: Sarah W. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?