George et al v. Beaver County et al
Plaintiff: Kathy M. George, Christal Shotwell and Christy Hass
Defendant: Beaver County, Cameron M. Noel and Tyler Fails
Case Number: 2:2016cv01076
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Beaver
Presiding Judge: Dustin B. Pead
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 107 Defendant Rose's Motion to Dismiss. The previously ordered scheduling order is due within seven (7) days of this Order. If the parties cannot agree to a scheduling order they must contact the Magistrate Judge by that same date. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/19/2020. (jds)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part 95 Motion for Scheduling Conference and to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Rose. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendant Rose by March 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/10/2020. (las)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 87 Motion for Summary Judgment. Within fourteen (14) days of this Order, the parties are directed to submit a proposed schedule for the resolution of Plaintiffs claim against Defendant Rose. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 8/19/2019. (las)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order denying 51 Motion to Amend/Correct ; granting 59 Motion to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file her Second Amended Complaint (Docket No. 59-1) within fourteen (14) days of this Order.DATED this 11th day of January, 2019. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/11/19. (jlw)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 55 Motion to Take Additional Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 12/12/18. (jlw)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/28/2017. (eat)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George et al v. Beaver County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy M. George
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Steele
Represented By: Todd D. Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christal Shotwell
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Steele
Represented By: Todd D. Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Hass
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Steele
Represented By: Todd D. Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaver County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron M. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Fails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?