Hewlett v. Utah State University et al

Plaintiff: Victoria Hewlett
Defendant: Utah State University, Sigma Chi Corporation, Gamma Kappa Alumni Foundation, Gamma Kappa, Eric Olsen, Krystin Deschamps and Kevin Webb
Case Number: 2:2016cv01141
Filed: November 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Denying 145 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 3/29/2019. (las)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 145 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 3/26/19 (alt)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 2/8/18 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewlett v. Utah State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Hewlett
Represented By: Jeffrey D Eisenberg
Represented By: John E Hansen
Represented By: Christopher P. Higley
Represented By: Jordan P. Kendell
Represented By: Sarah Marie Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah State University
Represented By: Meb W. Anderson
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigma Chi Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gamma Kappa Alumni Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gamma Kappa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Olsen
Represented By: Meb W. Anderson
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystin Deschamps
Represented By: Meb W. Anderson
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Webb
Represented By: Meb W. Anderson
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?