Daniels v. Utah State Prison

Petitioner: Jeffrey J. Daniels
Respondent: Utah State Prison and Third District Court
Case Number: 2:2016cv01228
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REOPEN: granting 14 Motion to Reopen Case. Petitioner shall have thirty days from the date of this order to cure the deficiencies noted; denying 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 14 Motion for Petitioners potential civil rights claim regarding mail tampering or legal access. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 05/16/2018. (kpf)
February 14, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER DISMISSAL ORDER. It is therefore ordered that because Petitioner's failure to comply with the Court's Order and to prosecute his case - the action is DISMISSED. This action is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 02/13/2018. (kpf)
September 26, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER TO AMEND DEFICIENT PETITION: Petitioner shall thirty days from the date of this order to cure the deficiencies noted. The Clerk's Office shall mail Petitioner a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide with a proper form petition and/or civil rights complaint for him to complete, according to the directions. IF Petitioner fails to timely cure the above noted deficiencies, as instructed herein, this action will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 09/26/2017. (kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Utah State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey J. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Utah State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Third District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?