Oblad v. Crowther et al
Plaintiff: Brian Oblad
Defendant: Scott Crowther, Lori Smith, FNU Blavis and Med Technicians
Case Number: 2:2017cv00102
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Jill N. Parrish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER to show Cause Regarding Failure to Xure Deficient Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff must within thirty days show cause why this case should not be dismissed because he has not, as required, cured the Se cond Amended Complaints deficiencies noted in order. If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the above deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action will be dismissed without further notice. Denying 68 Plaintiffs motion for stay and for the Court to transfer exhibits to the state court and to make exhibits available to him. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/5/2019. Clerks Office mailed Plaintiff the Pro Se Litigant Guide with a form civil-rights complaint.(jds)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 62 Motion to Consolidate this case with another case, 2:17-CV-95 DB and ORDER to Cure Deficient Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff must within thirty days cure the Second Amended Complaints deficiencies noted above. If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the above deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/8/2019. (jds)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: denying 50 Third Motion to Appoint Counsel and denying 53 Fourth Motion to Appoint Counsel; for the same reasons stated in the prior order in this case denying appointment of voluntary pro bono counsel 48 . The Clerk of Court shall take note that no further motions for appointed counsel will be accepted by the Court. Denying 52 Plaintiffs motion for discovery and depositions. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/3/2018. (jds)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: granting 43 Plaintiff's motion for permission to amend his Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint within thirty days. All other of Plaintiffs motions in this case are DENIED. Denying 42 Motion ; denying 45 Motion for Hearing; denying 46 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 47 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 5 Motion ; denying 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 7 Motion ; denying 8 Motion for Hearing; denying 9 Motion ; denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 30 Motion in Limine; denying 33 Motion ; denying 34 Motion to Dismiss Party. ; denying 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 38 Motion for Declaratory Judgment; denying 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 39 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/3/2018. (jds)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oblad v. Crowther et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Oblad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Crowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Blavis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med Technicians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?