Purple Innovations v. Honest Reviews et al

Plaintiff: Purple Innovations
Defendant: Honest Reviews, Ryan Monahan and GhostBed
Case Number: 2:2017cv00138
Filed: February 24, 2017
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2018 383 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERdenying 351 Motion for Sanctions; denying 352 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 12/10/2018. (mas)
July 9, 2018 342 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 315 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is hereby awarded attorneys fees and costs in the amount of $184,398.63, as a sanction against Defendants. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 7/6/2018. (mas)
February 12, 2018 292 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 229 Sealed Motion for Sanctions. Defendant GhostBed's counterclaims are hereby stricken and sanctions are awarded for Plaintiffs' reasonable attorneys' fees and costs in pursuing its second Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Sanctions, and an adverse jury instruction shall be given if deemed appropriate at the time of trial. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 2/9/2018. (blh)
November 7, 2017 242 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 196 Motion to Stay and Dissolve Preliminary Injunction pending appeal. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/7/2017. (blh)
July 25, 2017 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-the court DENIES Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and improper venue, DENIES Defendants' Motions to Transfer Venue, DENIES GhostBed's Motion to Dismiss pursu ant to Rule 12(b)(6), except with respect to Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action for Contributory False Association and False Advertising, for which GhostBed's Motion is GRANTED. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 7/25/17. (jmr)
June 2, 2017 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting in part 115 Sealed Motion re Plaintiff's request to initiate discovery, including a scheduling conference; denying 121 Motion to Stay Briefing; denying 122 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/1/2017. (blh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purple Innovations v. Honest Reviews et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purple Innovations
Represented By: Adam Alba
Represented By: Christine T. Greenwood
Represented By: James E. Magleby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honest Reviews
Represented By: W. Andrew McCullough
Represented By: Marc J. Randazza
Represented By: D. Gill Sperlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Monahan
Represented By: W. Andrew McCullough
Represented By: Marc J. Randazza
Represented By: D. Gill Sperlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GhostBed
Represented By: Bryson R. Brown
Represented By: Phillip S. Ferguson
Represented By: Ethan Horwitz
Represented By: Heather L. Thuet
Represented By: Eleanor M. Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?