Pitman et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Pitman and Liliana Damaschin
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Jeh Johnson, Board of Immigration Appeals, Loretta Lynch, Leon Rodriguez, A. Kristi Barrows, Laura McNeer, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Sarah Saldana and James Comey
Case Number: 2:2017cv00166
Filed: March 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERgranting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Compel Completion of the Administrative Record. The USCIS Defendants are ORDERED to produce to the Pitman Plaintiffs the documents required under this Order within fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/21/18. (jmr)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPLETE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion. The USCIS Defendants must produce within fourteen (14) days a privilege lo g which substantiates the assertion of the deliberative process privilege, or any other privilege, as a basis for withholding documents or portions of documents from the administrative record. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/2/18. (jmr)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS-denying 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; denying 37 Motion to Strike ; Motions terminated: 37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 35 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support filed by Liliana Damaschin, Tyler Pitman, 35 Defendant' ;s MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by James Comey, A. Kristi Barrows, Jeh Johnson, Board of Immigration Appeals, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Laura McNeer, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Loretta Lynch, Leon Rodriguez, Sarah Saldana. Within fourteen (14) days of this order, the parties must submit a proposed scheduling order setting forth the dates by which the filings required in DUCiv R 7-4(a)(5) will be made. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 12/1/17. (jmr)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss. This case is transferred to the District of Utah under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/7/17. (jdyne, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitman et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Pitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Damaschin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Sherease R. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Represented By: Sherease R. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Immigration Appeals
Represented By: Sherease R. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Lynch
Represented By: Sherease R. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Rodriguez
Represented By: Sherease R. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Kristi Barrows
Represented By: Sherease R. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura McNeer
Represented By: Sherease R. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Sherease R. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Saldana
Represented By: Sherease R. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Comey
Represented By: Sherease R. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?