Ortiz v. Torgenson et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Ortiz
Defendant: Sarah Torgenson, FNU Cultur, Roger Peterson, Glenn Pickett, Rusty Braithwait, FNU Allred, FNU George, Heather Anderson, FNU Ekkart, State of Utah and State of Utah Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2017cv00328
Filed: April 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER AFTER TENTH CIRCUIT'S REMAND OPINION: Denying 41 Motion to Compel. The Court's Order 33 Denying Counsel is VACATED. Plaintiff's Motion 12 for Appointment of Counsel is now Granted. The Clerk of Court must secure pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in pursuing, against Defendants Anderson and Peterson, his claim of unconstitutional retaliation. Counsel shall enter an appearance within fourteen days of appointment. See order for details. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 05/04/2021. (kpf)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Memorandum Decision & Order: denying 89 Motion for relief from Judgment. This action remains closed. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 11/20/2020. (kpf)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Memorandum Decision and Order Denying Motion to Alter or amend Judgment; It is ordered that Plaintiff's post judgment motion is Denying 72 Motion to Reconsider. This action remains closed. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 11/13/2019. (kpf)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM DECISION & Order granting Motion for Summary judgment: granting 36 Motion to Amend/Correct his complaint. This was unopposed by Defendants and used as the basis for the litigation from the date the motion was filed; denying 41 Motion to Compel; denying 49 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. With no controversy remaining in this Court, this action CLOSED. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 03/27/2019. (kpf)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER:granting 8 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). The United States Marshals Service shall serve a summons, a copy of Plaintiffs complaint, and a copy of this Order upon Defendants FNU Allred, Heather Anderson, Rusty Braithwait, FNU Cultur, FNU Ekkart, FNU George, Roger Peterson, Glenn Pickett, Sarah Torgenson. It is ordered that Defendant UDOC is DISMISSED. See order for details. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/26/2017. (kpf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Torgenson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Torgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Cultur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty Braithwait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ekkart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?