Prigge v. Romney et al
Plaintiff: |
Diane R. Prigge |
Defendant: |
V. Romney, Clark Boulton, Shannon Hill, Grant Nagamatsu, FNU Parker, Diane Allen, Mark Anderson, Andrea Carter, South Brunswick Township P.D. Officers, FNU Kellers, FNU Moody and FNU Wilcock |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00392 |
Filed: |
May 11, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Central Office |
County: |
Utah |
Presiding Judge: |
David Nuffer |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 11, 2019 |
Filing
27
MEMORANDUM DECISION & DISMISSAL ORDER: It is ordered that, because Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's order and has failed to prosecute this case, Plaintiffs actions is Dismissed without prejudice. This action is Closed. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 07/10/2019. (kpf)
|
April 30, 2019 |
Filing
26
ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT & MEMORANDUM DECISION: Plaintiff must within thirty days cure the Second Amended Complaint's Deficiencies noted. This is the fourth and FINAL order allowing Plaintiff to cure deficiencies in her complaint. If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the above deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 04/30/2019. (kpf)
|
January 25, 2019 |
Filing
24
SECOND ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENT AMENDED COMPLAINT & MEMORANDUM DECISION: Plaintiff must within thirty days cure the Complaint's deficiencies noted. The Clerk's Office shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide w ith a cord of complaint and habeas petition for Plaintiff to use should Plaintiff choose to file another amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to time cure the above deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action will be dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff's motion to Dismiss, Doc no. 23, is construed instead as a response to the cure order of November 21, 2018 (Doc no. 22) Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 01/25/2019. (kpf)
|
November 21, 2018 |
Filing
22
MEMORANDUM DECISION & Order to Cure Deficient Amended Complaint:Plaintiff must within thirty days cure the Amended Complaint's deficiencies noted. The Clerk's Office shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide w ith a form complaint and habes petition for plaintiff to use should Plaintiff choose to file another amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the above deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action will be dismissed without further notice. Denying 19 Motion for Service of Process. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/21/2018. (kpf)
|
January 29, 2018 |
Filing
17
ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENT COMPLAINT and MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 4 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). It is hereby ordered that: Plaintiff must within thirty days cure the Complaint's deficiencies noted. The Clerk' ;s Office shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide with a form complaint and habeas petition for Plaintiff to use should Plaintiff choose to file an amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the above deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 1/29/2018. (kpf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?