Truman v. Orem City et al

Plaintiff: Conrad Truman
Defendant: Orem City, Orem City Police Department, Thomas Wallace, William Crook, Orlando Ruiz, Art Lopez, Todd Ferre and Craig Johnson
Case Number: 2:2017cv00775
Filed: July 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Beaver
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This matter is before the Court on Defendants Objection to the Magistrate Judges Decision. On February 22, 2019, Magistrate Judge Furse granted in part and denied in part a motion to quash a subpoena filed by Ronald YengichPlaintiffs former counsel.In this case, Defendants have failed to demonstrate that Judge Furses decision was clearly erroneous or contrary to law. It is therefore ORDERED th at Defendants Objection to Magistrate Judge Decision 79 is OVERRULED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff supplement his privilege log in compliance withMagistrate Judge Furses Decision 78 within 15 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/30/19. (jlw)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Quash. The Court DENIES the portion of the Motion to Quash that applies to non-privileged or protected documents. Mr. Trumans counsel must review withheld docume nts to determine whether they contain non-privileged or non-protected material as outlined in this Order. If they do contain such material, Mr. Trumans counsel must produce all portions of documents containing such material and may redact portions of documents that remain protected. The privilege log should include all such redacted documents, with the bases for redaction discussed above. Mr. Trumans counsel must complete these actions by March 22, 2019.The Court DENIES the portion of the Mo tion to Quash that seeks to avoid production of a privilege log. Mr. Trumans counsel must produce to the Orem City Defendants a supplemental privilege log that includes sufficient detail to allow the Orem City Defendants to perceive clearly the basis for the privilege or protection claims by March 22, 2019.The Court GRANTS the remainder of the Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/22/19. (jlw)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM DECISION and order granting 47 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/20/18. (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truman v. Orem City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad Truman
Represented By: Lincoln W. Hobbs
Represented By: Mark R Moffat
Represented By: Sarah H. Orme
Represented By: Ann Marie Taliaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orem City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orem City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ferre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?