Jensen, Madison Jody the Estate of v. Duchesne County et al
Plaintiff: Jensen, Madison Jody the Estate of
Defendant: Duchesne County, David Boren, Jared Harrison, Jason Curry, Jeremy Curry, Jana Clyde and Logan Clark
Case Number: 2:2017cv01031
Filed: September 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order on 208 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant's motion for summary judgment as to his supervisory liability is GRANTED. Plaintiff's second cause of actio n for supervisory liability against Defendant is dismissed with prejudice. Defendant's motion for summary judgment as to his liability for deliberate indifference to the serious medical needs of a pretrial detainee is DENIED. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 09/15/2022. (mh)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting Defendant Elizabeth Richens' 122 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Defendant Jana Clyde's 133 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant David Boren's 135 Motio n for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant Hollie Purdy's 136 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant Gerald J. Ross Jr.'s 137 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant Jason Curry's 138 Motion for Summary Jud gment; granting Defendant Caleb Bird's 139 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant Duchesne County's 140 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying Defendant Kennon Tubbs' 141 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/21/2020. (eat)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying Defendant Kennon Tubbs' 101 Motion to Dismiss; and denying Defendant Logan Clark's 104 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/22/2019. (eat)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 106 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's punitive damages claim against Defendant Duchesne County. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 4/24/2019. (eat)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Logan Clark's 73 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint against Clark is dismissed without prejudice, and Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint by 2/15/2019. The fact discovery deadline for all parties is extended to 6/14/2019. The parties shall submit an amended scheduling order to Magistrate Judge Furse by 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/25/2019. (eat)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen, Madison Jody the Estate of v. Duchesne County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jensen, Madison Jody the Estate of
Represented By: Scott S. Bridge
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duchesne County
Represented By: Britton R. Butterfield
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Boren
Represented By: Britton R. Butterfield
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Harrison
Represented By: Britton R. Butterfield
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Curry
Represented By: Britton R. Butterfield
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Curry
Represented By: Britton R. Butterfield
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Clyde
Represented By: Britton R. Butterfield
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Clark
Represented By: Britton R. Butterfield
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?