Amann v. Office of the Utah Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Paul G. Amann
Defendant: Office of the Utah Attorney General, Sean Reyes and Bridget Romano
Case Number: 2:2018cv00341
Filed: April 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Jill N. Parrish
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 182 Motion to Compel; terminating 182 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/25/21. (alf)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion to Compel; The court also grants the AGOs request for an award of reasonable attorney fees incurred in responding to the motion based on Mr. Amanns counsels failure to meet and confer. The parties shall meet and confer and try in good faith to agree on the amount of the fee award. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/7/21. (alf)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 157 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/5/21. (alf)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See order for specifics. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/2/21. (alf)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 132 Second Motion to quash subpoena. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding time limitations and search terms by June 2, 2021. Follow up/Status Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg to resolve any remaining disputes and to set a deadline for compliance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/28/21. (alf)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Affirming Magistrate Judge 114 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and Short Form Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiff's 120 Objection to Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/25/21. (jwt)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 15 Plaintiffs Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/28/2019. (jds)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amann v. Office of the Utah Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul G. Amann
Represented By: Lauren I. Scholnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Utah Attorney General
Represented By: Daniel R. Widdison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Reyes
Represented By: Daniel R. Widdison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridget Romano
Represented By: Daniel R. Widdison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?