Contagious v. Bella B et al

Plaintiff: Contagious
Defendant: Bella B and Michael Yi
Case Number: 2:2018cv00502
Filed: June 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Wasatch
0 Judge: Dustin B Pead
1 Judge: Robert J Shelby
2 Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Filing 20 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Bateman, Randall)
August 17, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Lauren N. Chauncey filed by Lauren N. Chauncey on behalf of Contagious (Chauncey, Lauren)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 8/15/2018. (mjm)
August 13, 2018 Filing 17 After review of the case, case reassigned to District Judge per 16 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (las)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. In light of the pending Motion to Dismiss #12 and the need to decide this motion in a judicious and timely manner, the undersigned orders that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 8/13/18. (docket text order, no attached document)(mjw)
August 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Bella B, Michael Yi, Plaintiff Contagious. Form due by 8/27/2018. (las)
August 10, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Bella B, Michael Yi, Plaintiff Contagious. (las)
August 9, 2018 Filing 13 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Contagious. (Bateman, Randall)
August 8, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support , MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Bella B, Michael Yi. (London, Jesse)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Bella B answer due 8/8/2018; Michael Yi answer due 8/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 8/7/2018. (las)
August 6, 2018 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Bella B, Michael Yi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Order for Extension of Time)(London, Jesse)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse L. London for Bella B,Jesse L. London for Michael Yi. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 7/26/2018. (las)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse L. London , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3061501, filed by Defendants Bella B, Michael Yi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Pro Hac Order) Attorney Devin W. Miller added to party Bella B(pty:dft), Attorney Devin W. Miller added to party Michael Yi(pty:dft)(Miller, Devin)
July 12, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Contagious as to Michael Yi served on 7/6/2018, answer due 7/27/2018. (Bateman, Randall)
July 11, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Contagious as to Bella B served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/25/2018. (Bateman, Randall)
June 22, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Yi. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 22, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Bella B. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 22, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (nl)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3035606) filed by Contagious. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-VA 2-092-811, #3 Exhibit B-Infringing Photos, #4 Exhibit C-VA 2-100-358, #5 Exhibit D-Infringing Photos, #6 Exhibit E-VA 2-100-608, #7 Exhibit F-Infringing Photos, #8 Exhibit G-Infringing photos covered by pending applications) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Bateman, Randall)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff Contagious is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contagious v. Bella B et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella B
Represented By: Jesse L. London
Represented By: Devin W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Yi
Represented By: Jesse L. London
Represented By: Devin W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contagious
Represented By: Randall B. Bateman
Represented By: Sarah W. Matthews
Represented By: Lauren N. Chauncey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?