Moreno v. Polarityte et al
Plaintiff: Jose Moreno
Defendant: Denver Lough, Jeff Dyer and Polarityte
Case Number: 2:2018cv00510
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Parties stipulated joint motion to stay the courts Order to Propose Schedule entry #11 . The tasks set forth in the Order to Propose Schedule (Dkt. No. 11) shall not occur unless and until the action proceeds past the motion-to-dismiss stage; and In the event that the action proceeds past the motion-to-dismiss stage, the Order to Propose Schedule (Dkt. No. 11) shall not be considered to be entered until twenty-one (21) days after the order denying a motion to dismiss has been issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/10/2018. (jds)
August 7, 2018 Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION to Stay re #11 Order to Propose Schedule (Joint) filed by Defendants Jeff Dyer, Denver Lough, Polarityte. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Black, Kenneth)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michele D. Johnson for Jeff Dyer,Michele D. Johnson for Denver Lough,Michele D. Johnson for Polarityte. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/2/2018. No attached document. (jds)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas J. Siciliano for Jeff Dyer,Nicholas J. Siciliano for Denver Lough,Nicholas J. Siciliano for Polarityte. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/2/2018. (jds)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Whitney B. Weber for Jeff Dyer,Whitney B. Weber for Denver Lough,Whitney B. Weber for Polarityte. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/2/2018. (jds)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Rawlinson for Jeff Dyer,Matthew Rawlinson for Denver Lough,Matthew Rawlinson for Polarityte. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/2/2018. (jds)
August 1, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michele D. Johnson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3068547, filed by Defendants Jeff Dyer, Denver Lough, Polarityte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Menssen, Michael)
August 1, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas J. Siciliano , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3068545, filed by Defendants Jeff Dyer, Denver Lough, Polarityte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Menssen, Michael)
August 1, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Whitney B. Weber , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3068544, filed by Defendants Jeff Dyer, Denver Lough, Polarityte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Menssen, Michael)
August 1, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Rawlinson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3068538, filed by Defendants Jeff Dyer, Denver Lough, Polarityte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Menssen, Michael)
August 1, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Jeff Dyer, Denver Lough, Polarityte. (Black, Kenneth)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/31/18. (dla)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Stipulated Motion Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' response to the Complaint shall not be due until after this court appoints a lead plaintiff and lead counsel, lead plaintiff serves or designates an operative complaint, and the parties agree to a schedule for Defendants to respond to the operative complaint and a schedule for any anticipated briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/31/18. (dla)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/26/18. (ss)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendants Jeff Dyer, Denver Lough, Polarityte. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Kenneth)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Richard Menssen on behalf of Jeff Dyer, Denver Lough, Polarityte (Menssen, Michael)
July 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Black on behalf of Jeff Dyer, Denver Lough, Polarityte (Black, Kenneth)
July 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #4 filed by Plaintiff Jose Moreno (Scofield, David)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 6/29/18. (ss)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jeffrey C. Block and Jacob A. Walker, for Plaintiff Jose Moreno. (nl)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3038918) filed by Jose Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certification of Jose Moreno) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Scofield, David)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Jose Moreno is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Polarityte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Lough
Represented By: Whitney B. Weber
Represented By: Michele D. Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Nicholas J. Siciliano
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Dyer
Represented By: Whitney B. Weber
Represented By: Michele D. Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Nicholas J. Siciliano
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polarityte
Represented By: Whitney B. Weber
Represented By: Michele D. Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Nicholas J. Siciliano
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Moreno
Represented By: David W. Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?