Sandoval v. Tech Data Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Jusup Sandoval
Defendant: Patrick Batton and Tech Data Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00573
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2018 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Patrick Batton. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 23, 2018 5 File Received from 3rd District Court, Silver Summit, Summit County consisting of docket sheet and documents filed in state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Withdrawal of Counsel, #3 Return of Service, #4 Notice of Removal) (las)
July 20, 2018 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Tech Data Corporation.(Janicki, Robert)
July 19, 2018 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jusup Sandoval, Defendant Tech Data Corporation. (tlh)
July 18, 2018 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District Court, Summit County, case number 180500147, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3056074) filed by Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Return of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Stahler, Michael)
July 18, 2018 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Defendant Tech Data Corporation is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval v. Tech Data Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jusup Sandoval
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Gooch
Represented By: Brady L. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Batton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tech Data Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Stahler
Represented By: Robert L. Janicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?